This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 06/04/2022 at 14:15:54 (UTC).

ANGELOS KOLOBOTOS, et al vs. PROPEL FINANCIAL SERVICE

Case Summary

On 09/07/2021 ANGELOS KOLOBOTOS filed an Other lawsuit against PROPEL FINANCIAL SERVICE. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are PARKER, TONYA and PARKER, TONYA, PARKER, TONYA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2530

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

PARKER, TONYA

PARKER, TONYA, PARKER, TONYA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KOLOBOTOS, ANGELOS

STAMATINA HOLDINGS, LLC

Defendant

PROPEL FINANCIAL SERVICE

C/O Brian Bellamy, 4330 Gaines Ranch Loop Ste 150

Austin, TX 78735

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ALTICK, MATTHEW J.

 

Court Documents

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORDER FOR TRO

ORIGINAL PETITION

dism letter (116th)

DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer(s): PARKER, TONYA, PARKER, TONYA; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM

DISMISSED FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION

Disposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer; PARKER, TONYA; Judgment Type; DISMISSED FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judgment; Total Judgment:; of $0.00; Awarded To:; KOLOBOTOS, ANGELOS, et al; Awarded Against:; KOLOBOTOS, ANGELOS, et al

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORDER FOR TRO

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT

dism letter (116th)

DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer(s): PARKER, TONYA, PARKER, TONYA; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM

dism letter (116th)

DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer(s): PARKER, TONYA, PARKER, TONYA; Hearing Time: 8:45 AM

FP NOTICE OF ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION

NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED

FP NOTICE OF ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION

NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer: PARKER, TONYA; Judgment Type: DISMISSED FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judgment: Total Judgment:; of $0.00: Awarded To:; KOLOBOTOS, ANGELOS, et al: Awarded Against:; KOLOBOTOS, ANGELOS, et al

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer(s): PARKER, TONYA, PARKER, TONYA; Hearing Time: 8:45 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer(s): PARKER, TONYA, PARKER, TONYA; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for KOLOBOTOS, ANGELOS : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 59426-2021-DCLK; KOLOBOTOS, ANGELOS $292.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for KOLOBOTOS, ANGELOS : Transaction Assessment; ; $292.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: KOLOBOTOS, ANGELOS ; Total Financial Assessment $292.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $292.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STAMATINA HOLDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Propel Financial Services LLC, as Agent and Attorney in Fact for TLF National Tax Li is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ALTICK, MATTHEW J.