This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 01/26/2023 at 18:26:54 (UTC).

ANGEL HOSPITALITY VI, LLC vs. DALLAS CENTRAL APPRAISAL DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 09/13/2021 ANGEL HOSPITALITY VI, LLC filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against DALLAS CENTRAL APPRAISAL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is PURDY, MONICA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3182

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

PURDY, MONICA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANGEL HOSPITALITY VI, LLC

Defendant

DALLAS CENTRAL APPRAISAL DISTRICT

2949 North Stemmons Freeway

Dallas, TX 75247

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GANDHI, NIRAL R

Defendant Attorney

METCALF, BRADEN W.

 

Court Documents

EXECUTED CITATION: DALLAS CENTRAL APPRAISAL DISTRICT

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION: DALLAS CENTRAL APPRAISAL DISTRICT

ORIGINAL ANSWER

- GENERAL DENIAL; ORIGINAL ANSWER

JURY DEMAND FORM

JURY DEMAND

CORRESPONDENCE LETTER FOR ISSUE

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION

ISSUE CITATION - DALLAS CENTRAL APPRAISAL DISTRICT

ISSUE CITATION

95TH JURY TRIAL NOTICE I

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: PURDY, MONICA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: BY COURT ADMINISTRATOR; Comment: L3

FP NOTICE OF AGREED JUDGMENT RULE 306(a)(3)-BRADEN METCALF

NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED

FP NOTICE OF AGREED JUDGMENT RULE 306(a)(3)-NIRAL GANDHI

NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED

PROPOSED AGREED JUDGMENT ORDER

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED AGREED JUDGMENT

SCHEDULING ORDER (LEVEL 3)

SCHEDULING ORDER; Comment: LEVEL 3

ORIGINAL ANSWER

- GENERAL DENIAL; ORIGINAL ANSWER

EXECUTED CITATION: DALLAS CENTRAL APPRAISAL DISTRICT

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION: DALLAS CENTRAL APPRAISAL DISTRICT

ISSUE CITATION - DALLAS CENTRAL APPRAISAL DISTRICT

ISSUE CITATION

JURY DEMAND FORM

JURY DEMAND

CORRESPONDENCE LETTER FOR ISSUE

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION

AGREED JUDGMENT

Disposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer; PURDY, MONICA; Judgment Type; AGREED JUDGMENT; Judgment; Total Judgment:; of $0.00; Awarded To:; ANGEL HOSPITALITY VI, LLC, et al; Awarded Against:; ANGEL HOSPITALITY VI, LLC, et al

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: PURDY, MONICA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: BY COURT ADMINISTRATOR; Comment: L3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer: PURDY, MONICA; Judgment Type: AGREED JUDGMENT; Judgment: Total Judgment:; of $0.00: Awarded To:; ANGEL HOSPITALITY VI, LLC, et al: Awarded Against:; ANGEL HOSPITALITY VI, LLC, et al

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED AGREED JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSCHEDULING ORDER; Comment: LEVEL 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketTRIAL SETTING (JURY); Comment: Trial Notice and Scheduling Order e-mailed to counsel.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket- GENERAL DENIAL; ORIGINAL ANSWER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION: DALLAS CENTRAL APPRAISAL DISTRICT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketCITATION; Served: 09/30/2021; Anticipated Server: ESERVE; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Returned; 10/06/2021: Comment; DALLAS CENTRAL APPRAISAL DISTRICT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for ANGEL HOSPITALITY VI, LLC : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 60691-2021-DCLK; ANGEL HOSPITALITY VI, LLC $340.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for ANGEL HOSPITALITY VI, LLC : Transaction Assessment; ; $340.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: ANGEL HOSPITALITY VI, LLC ; Total Financial Assessment $340.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $340.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJURY DEMAND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less