This case was last updated from Dallas County Texas Courts on 05/16/2022 at 19:39:30 (UTC).

ANA CLAROS vs.TRH LEGACY GROUP, LLC D/B/A MCDONALD'S #17226

Case Summary

On 09/10/2021 ANA CLAROS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against TRH LEGACY GROUP, LLC D/B/A MCDONALD'S 17226. This case was filed in Dallas County Texas Courts, Dallas County Texas Courts At Law located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is MONTGOMERY, SALLY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********53-C

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

MONTGOMERY, SALLY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CLAROS, ANA

Defendant

TRH LEGACY GROUP, LLC D/B/A MCDONALD'S #17226

13217 Padre Avenue

Keller, TX 76244

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JASSO, JORGE

Defendant Attorney

WHITEHURST, DAVID WALTON

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

CITATION 2012

ISSUE CITATION; Comment: ESERVE# 57147033

RETURN OF SERVICE TRH LEGACY GROUP LLC

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: TRH LEGACY GROUP LLC

ORIGINAL ANSWER

- GENERAL DENIAL; ORIGINAL ANSWER

PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

CITATION 2012

ISSUE CITATION; Comment: ESERVE# 57147033

RETURN OF SERVICE TRH LEGACY GROUP LLC

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: TRH LEGACY GROUP LLC

ORIGINAL ANSWER

- GENERAL DENIAL; ORIGINAL ANSWER

NOTICE OF FILING BUSINESS RECORDS AFFIDAVITS

NOTICE OF FILING BUSINESS RECORDS AFFIDAVITS; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S

LETTER TO FILE

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: RE:PROPOSED AGREED ORDER GRANTING PLEA IN ABATEMENT AND MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

PROPOSED ORDER

PROPOSED ORDER; Comment: PROPOSED AGREED ORDER GRANTING PLEA IN ABATEMENT AND MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE

SUPPLEMENTAL - NOTICE

ORDER - ABATE

ORDER - ABATE; Comment: AGREED; PLEA IN ABATEMENT AND MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketDISMISSAL HEARING; Judicial Officer: MONTGOMERY, SALLY; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED; Comment: AGREED PLEA ABATE/COMPEL O/SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketNON JURY TRIAL; Judicial Officer: MONTGOMERY, SALLY; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: REQUESTED BY JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - ABATE; Comment: AGREED; PLEA IN ABATEMENT AND MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUPPLEMENTAL - NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER; Comment: PROPOSED AGREED ORDER GRANTING PLEA IN ABATEMENT AND MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: RE:PROPOSED AGREED ORDER GRANTING PLEA IN ABATEMENT AND MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING BUSINESS RECORDS AFFIDAVITS; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket- GENERAL DENIAL; ORIGINAL ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: TRH LEGACY GROUP LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for CLAROS, ANA : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (CC); Receipt # CV-2021-09428; CLAROS, ANA $281.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for CLAROS, ANA : Transaction Assessment; ; $281.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: CLAROS, ANA ; Total Financial Assessment $281.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $281.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketCITATION (SERVICE); Served: 09/16/2021; Anticipated Server: ATTORNEY; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; OUT OF COUNTY: Returned; 09/20/2021: Comment; TRH LEGACY GROUP, LLC D/B/A MCDONALD'S #17226

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION; Comment: ESERVE# 57147033

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where McDonald's is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David W Whitehurst