This case was last updated from Dallas County Texas Courts on 12/01/2022 at 04:09:24 (UTC).

AMY GRAVES vs.MAYNARD JOHNSON

Case Summary

On 09/09/2022 AMY GRAVES filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MAYNARD JOHNSON. This case was filed in Dallas County Texas Courts, Dallas County Texas Courts At Law located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is BELLAN, MELISSA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********38-B

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

BELLAN, MELISSA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GRAVES, AMY

Dallas, AL 75251

Defendant

JOHNSON, MAYNARD

Dallas, TX 75218

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STUCKY, RICHARD A.

Defendant Attorney

SPEER, GARY R., Jr

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION, JURY DEMAND, AND RULE 193.7 NOTICE

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION, JURY DEMAND, AND RULE 193.7 NOTICE

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION; Comment: E-SERVE ENV# 68119842

RETURN OF SERVICE

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: SERVED MAYNARD JOHNSON, 9/14/22 AT 1:59 PM

ORIGINAL ANSWER

ORIGINAL ANSWER

ORIGINAL ANSWER

ORIGINAL ANSWER

JURY DEMAND

JURY DEMAND

AMENDED ANSWER AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL

AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL

ORDER - MEDIATION

ORDER - MEDIATION

CCL#2 JURY TRIAL LTR

JURY TRIAL; Judicial Officer: BELLAN, MELISSA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

CCL#2 JURY TRIAL LTR

JURY TRIAL; Judicial Officer: BELLAN, MELISSA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJURY TRIAL; Judicial Officer: BELLAN, MELISSA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - MEDIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJURY DEMAND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL ANSWER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL ANSWER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: SERVED MAYNARD JOHNSON, 9/14/22 AT 1:59 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for GRAVES, AMY : STATE CREDIT; ; $137.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for GRAVES, AMY : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (CC); Receipt # CV-2022-08837; GRAVES, AMY $221.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for GRAVES, AMY : Transaction Assessment; ; $358.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: GRAVES, AMY ; Total Financial Assessment $358.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $358.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketCITATION (SERVICE); Served: 09/14/20221:59 PM; Anticipated Server: ATTORNEY; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Returned; 09/15/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketJURY DEMAND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION; Comment: E-SERVE ENV# 68119842

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION, JURY DEMAND, AND RULE 193.7 NOTICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SPEER, GARY R., Jr.