This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 03/31/2022 at 01:49:25 (UTC).

AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY vs. BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

Case Summary

On 07/29/2021 AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against BANK OF AMERICA, N A. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAMS, STACI. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9872

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAMS, STACI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY

Defendant

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

18229 Midway Rd.

Dallas, TX 75287

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CABAL, MAC W.

 

Court Documents

NON-SUIT/DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF / PETITIONER

Disposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer; WILLIAMS, STACI; Judgment Type; NON-SUIT/DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF / PETITIONER; Judgment; Total Judgment:; of $0.00; Awarded To:; AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY; Awarded Against:; BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF NONSUIT

NOTICE OF NONSUIT

AMENDED PETITION

AMENDED PETITION

(PROPOSED) ORDER OF NONSUIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: (PROPOSED) ORDER OF NONSUIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE

101st Dismissal Letter - 2017

DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, STACI; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

ISSUE WRIT OF AMENDED GARNISHMENT AFTER JUDGMENT - BANK OF AMERICA NA

ISSUE WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AND NOTICE; Comment: AMENDED

101st Dismissal Letter - 2017

DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, STACI; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

MAILED MAC CABAL COPY OF NONSUIT ORDER

NOTE - CLERKS; Comment: MAILED COPY OF NONSUIT ORDER

ORIGINAL PETITION

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTE - CLERKS; Comment: MAILED COPY OF NONSUIT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, STACI; Judgment Type: NON-SUIT/DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF / PETITIONER; Judgment: Total Judgment:; of $0.00: Awarded To:; AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY: Awarded Against:; BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, STACI; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: (PROPOSED) ORDER OF NONSUIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF NONSUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED WRIT OF GARNISHMENT - BANK OF AMERICA NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketWRIT OF GARNISHMENT AFTER JUDGMENT; Served: 08/20/2021; Anticipated Server: ESERVE; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; OUT OF COUNTY: Returned; 08/27/2021: Comment; BANK OF AMERICA NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 49332-2021-DCLK; AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY $308.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY : Transaction Assessment; ; $308.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY ; Total Financial Assessment $308.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $308.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AND NOTICE; Comment: AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases where American Contractors Indemnity Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CABAL, MAC W.