This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 01/13/2022 at 18:16:08 (UTC).

ALLY FINANCIAL INC. vs. ARMANDINA LOPEZ TAYLOR

Case Summary

On 11/22/2021 ALLY FINANCIAL INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ARMANDINA LOPEZ TAYLOR. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is MOYE', ERIC. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7078

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

MOYE', ERIC

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALLY FINANCIAL INC.

Defendant

TAYLOR, ARMANDINA LOPEZ

Canton, TX 75103

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LYNCH, PATRICK M.

 

Court Documents

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION

APP-WRIT SEQUESTRATION

APPLICATION FOR WRIT/SEQUESTRATION

PROPOSED ORDER-WRIT SEQUESTRATION

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER-WRIT SEQUESTRATION

ISSUE CITATION - ARMANDIN LOPEZ TAYLOR

ISSUE CITATION

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Comment: MAILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketDISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: MOYE', ERIC; Hearing Time: 2:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Comment: MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketCITATION; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ESERVE: Anticipated Method; Comment: ARMANDINA LOPEZ TAYLOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER-WRIT SEQUESTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR WRIT/SEQUESTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for ALLY FINANCIAL INC. : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 78566-2021-DCLK; ALLY FINANCIAL INC. $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for ALLY FINANCIAL INC. : Transaction Assessment; ; $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: ALLY FINANCIAL INC. ; Total Financial Assessment $300.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ally Financial Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Patrick M Lynch