This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 05/28/2023 at 12:25:04 (UTC).

ALICIA CONTRERAS MAR vs. SABASTIAN COLE JOHNSON

Case Summary

On 11/28/2022 ALICIA CONTRERAS MAR filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SABASTIAN COLE JOHNSON. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is PURDY, MONICA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6334

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

PURDY, MONICA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CONTRERAS MAR, ALICIA

Defendant

JOHNSON, SABASTIAN COLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SWANSON, BENJAMIN D, ESQ

Defendant Attorney

GIBBS, JAMES O.

 

Court Documents

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: CERT MAIL, WAITING ON CITATION FEE

CIVIL PROCESS REQUEST

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: CERT MAIL, WAITING ON CITATION FEE

FEES FOR ISSUANCE

REQUEST FOR SERVICE

ISSUE CITATION - SABASTIAN COLE JOHNSON

ISSUE CITATION

EXECUTED CITATION - SABASTIAN COLE JOHNSON

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - SABASTIAN COLE JOHNSON

ORIGINAL ANSWER

- GENERAL DENIAL; ORIGINAL ANSWER

FP FILE DESK JURY DEMAND FORM

JURY DEMAND

SCHEDULING ORDER LEVEL 3

SCHEDULING ORDER; Comment: LEVEL 3

95TH JURY TRIAL NOTICE I

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: PURDY, MONICA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: L3

NOTICE OF INTENTION

DISCOVERY; Comment: NOTICE OF INTENTION TO TAKE DEPOSITION BY WRITTEN QUESTIONS

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF AFFIDAVITS

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: NOTICE OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF INTENTION

DISCOVERY; Comment: NOTICE OF INTENTION

NOTICE OF FILING COUNTER-AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: NOTICE OF FILING COUNTER-AFFIDAVIT

NOTICE OF FILING COUNTER AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: NOTICE OF FILING COUNTER AFFIDAVIT

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2024
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: PURDY, MONICA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: L3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Comment: NOTICE OF FILING COUNTER AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Comment: NOTICE OF FILING COUNTER-AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISCOVERY; Comment: NOTICE OF INTENTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • DocketVACATION LETTER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Comment: NOTICE OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISCOVERY; Comment: NOTICE OF INTENTION TO TAKE DEPOSITION BY WRITTEN QUESTIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for JOHNSON, SABASTIAN COLE : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 2945-2023-DCLK; JOHNSON, SABASTIAN COLE $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for JOHNSON, SABASTIAN COLE : Transaction Assessment; ; $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • FinancialFinancial: JOHNSON, SABASTIAN COLE ; Total Financial Assessment $10.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 12/12/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for CONTRERAS MAR, ALICIA : Transaction Assessment; ; $8.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for CONTRERAS MAR, ALICIA : STATE CREDIT; ; $137.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for CONTRERAS MAR, ALICIA : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 74901-2022-DCLK; CONTRERAS MAR, ALICIA $304.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for CONTRERAS MAR, ALICIA : Transaction Assessment; ; $441.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: CONTRERAS MAR, ALICIA ; Total Financial Assessment $449.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $449.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketJURY DEMAND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: CERT MAIL, WAITING ON CITATION FEE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less