This case was last updated from Dallas County Texas Courts on 06/24/2022 at 18:11:12 (UTC).

ADINA WARREN, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF RALEIGH DAVIS WARREN, DECEASED, DAWN WARREN-CARTER, LASHANTE WARREN-SHELTON.et al vs.CHRISTUS HEALTH ARK-LA-TEX D/B/A CHRISTUS ST. MICHAEL REHABILITATION HOSPITAL, CHRISTUS HE

Case Summary

On 03/10/2022 ADINA WARREN, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF RALEIGH DAVIS WARREN, DECEASED, DAWN WARREN-CARTER, LASHANTE WARREN-SHELTON filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CHRISTUS HEALTH ARK-LA-TEX D/B/A CHRISTUS ST MICHAEL REHABILITATION HOSPITAL, CHRISTUS HE. This case was filed in Dallas County Texas Courts, Dallas County Texas Courts At Law located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is MONTGOMERY, SALLY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********19-C

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

MONTGOMERY, SALLY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ADINA WARREN, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF RALEIGH DAVIS WARREN, DECEASED

Dallas, TX 75230

WARREN-CARTER, DAWN

Dallas, TX 75230

WARREN-SHELTON, LASHANTE

Dallas, TX 75230

WARREN, RALEIGH KEYES

Dallas, TX 75230

Defendants

CHRISTUS HEALTH ARK-LA-TEX D/B/A CHRISTUS ST. MICHAEL REHABILITATION HOSPITAL

211 E. 7Th Street, Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

CHRISTUS HEALTH

211 E 7Th Street, Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VAN WEY, KAY L

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION AND JURY DEMAND

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION AND JURY DEMAND

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION; Comment: E-SERVE ENV# 62535712

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION; Comment: E-SERVE ENV# 62535712

CHRISTUS HEALTH

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: CHRISTUS HEALTH

HEALTH ARK-LA-TEX D/B/A CHRISTUS ST. MICHAEL REHAB HOSPITAL

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: CHRISTlfS HEALTH ARK-LA-TEX D/B/A CHRISTUS ST. MICHAEL REHAB!LIT.\TION HOSPITAL

CCL#3 DWOP 165a

DISMISSAL HEARING; Judicial Officer: MONTGOMERY, SALLY; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

CCL#3 DWOP 165a

DISMISSAL HEARING; Judicial Officer: MONTGOMERY, SALLY; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

CCL#3 DWOP 165a

DISMISSAL HEARING; Judicial Officer: MONTGOMERY, SALLY; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL HEARING; Judicial Officer: MONTGOMERY, SALLY; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: CHRISTUS HEALTH ARK-LA-TEX D/B/A CHRISTUS ST. MICHAEL REHAB!LIT.\TION HOSPITAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: CHRISTUS HEALTH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketCITATION (SERVICE); Served: 03/16/2022; Anticipated Server: ATTORNEY; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Returned; 03/18/2022: Served; 03/16/2022: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Actual Server: PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER; Returned: 03/18/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for ADINA WARREN, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF RALEIGH DAVIS WARREN, DECEASED : STATE CREDIT; ; $137.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for ADINA WARREN, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF RALEIGH DAVIS WARREN, DECEASED : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (CC); Receipt # CV-2022-02196; WARREN, ADINA $229.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for ADINA WARREN, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF RALEIGH DAVIS WARREN, DECEASED : Transaction Assessment; ; $366.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: ADINA WARREN, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF RALEIGH DAVIS WARREN, DECEASED ; Total Financial Assessment $366.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $366.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION; Comment: E-SERVE ENV# 62535712

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION AND JURY DEMAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CHRISTUS HEALTH ARK-LA-TEX is a litigant

Latest cases where Christus Health is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VAN WEY, KAY L