This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 07/03/2022 at 18:03:38 (UTC).

ADAN GORROSTIETA vs. AUDREY SHANTE WILLIAMS, et al

Case Summary

On 12/23/2021 ADAN GORROSTIETA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against AUDREY SHANTE WILLIAMS. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is WHITMORE, BRIDGETT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8247

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

WHITMORE, BRIDGETT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GORROSTIETA, ADAN

Dallas, TX 75204

Defendants

WILLIAMS, AUDREY SHANTE

Mesquite, TX 75150-6154

OLD REPUBLIC GENERAL INSURANCE GROUP, INC.

1999 Bryan Street, Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201-3136

OLD REPUBLIC INSURANCE COMPANY

1999 Bryan Street, Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201-3136

GALLAGHER BASSETT SERVICES, INC.

211 E. 7Th Street, Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701-3218

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KASTL, KRISTINA N.

Defendant Attorney

PELAYO, JAZMINE

 

Court Documents

JURY DEMAND FORM

JURY DEMAND

NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVITS

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVITS

NOTICE OF FILING BUSINESS RECORDS

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: NOTICE OF FILING BUSINESS RECORDS

EXECUTED CITATION - AUDREY SHANTE WILLIAMS

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - AUDREY SHANTE WILLIAMS

ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTE SERVICE

ORDER - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE

PROPOSED ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTE SERVICE

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTE SERVICE

MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTE SERVICE

MOTION - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE

SCHEDULING ORDER

SCHEDULING ORDER; Comment: (LEVEL 3)

NOTICE

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: WHITMORE, BRIDGETT; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

193rd Jury Trial Notice Whitmore

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: WHITMORE, BRIDGETT; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

193rd Jury Trial Notice Whitmore

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: WHITMORE, BRIDGETT; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

193rd Jury Trial Notice Whitmore

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: WHITMORE, BRIDGETT; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

193RD Initial Dismissal Notice

DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: WHITMORE, BRIDGETT; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: BY COURT ADMINISTRATOR

ISSUE CITATION- GALLAGHER BASSETT SERVICES INC

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION- OLD REPUBLIC INSURANCE COMPANY

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION- OLD REPUBLIC GENERAL INSURANCE GROUP INC

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION- AUDREY SHANTE WILLIAMS

ISSUE CITATION

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: WHITMORE, BRIDGETT; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Comment: NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVITS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Comment: NOTICE OF FILING BUSINESS RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - AUDREY SHANTE WILLIAMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTE SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: WHITMORE, BRIDGETT; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: BY COURT ADMINISTRATOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSCHEDULING ORDER; Comment: (LEVEL 3)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket- GENERAL DENIAL; ORIGINAL ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCITATION; Served: 01/27/2022; Anticipated Server: ESERVE; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Returned; 01/28/2022: Comment; OLD REPUBLIC INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCITATION; Served: 01/21/2022; Anticipated Server: ESERVE; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Returned; 01/24/2022: Comment; OLD REPUBLIC GENERAL INSURANCE GROUP INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCITATION; Served: 04/11/2022; Anticipated Server: ESERVE; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Returned; 04/12/2022: Comment; AUDREY SHANTE WILLIAMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for GORROSTIETA, ADAN : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 84302-2021-DCLK; GORROSTIETA, ADAN $364.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for GORROSTIETA, ADAN : Transaction Assessment; ; $364.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: GORROSTIETA, ADAN ; Total Financial Assessment $364.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $364.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJURY DEMAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GALLAGHER BASSET SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases where OLD REPUBLIC INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where OLD REPUBLIC GENERAL INSURANCE GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PELAYO, JAZMINE