This case was last updated from Dallas County Texas Courts on 09/28/2022 at 00:48:21 (UTC).

AARON GARZA vs. ASHLEY DEE VOSS, KAYSE LEIGH HAMPTON, CLAYTON ALAN HAMPTON.et al

Case Summary

On 08/05/2022 AARON GARZA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ASHLEY DEE VOSS, KAYSE LEIGH HAMPTON, CLAYTON ALAN HAMPTON. This case was filed in Dallas County Texas Courts, Dallas County Texas Courts At Law located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is MONTGOMERY, SALLY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********64-C

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

MONTGOMERY, SALLY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GARZA, AARON

Dallas, TX 75251

Defendants

VOSS, ASHLEY DEE

Louis, MO 63136

HAMPTON, KAYSE LEIGH

Justin, TX 76247

HAMPTON, CLAYTON ALAN

Justin, TX 76247

ALLEN, GILBERTO OSVALDO, Jr.

Hill, TX 75104

GHEEN, KIMBERLY DENISE

Worth, TX 76123

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STUCKY, RICHARD A.

Defendant Attorney

COLANERI, JANET KRISTINA

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION, JURY DEMAND, AND RULE 193.7 NOTICE

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION, JURY DEMAND, AND RULE 193.7 NOTICE

CITATION 2012

ISSUE CITATION; Comment: ESERVE- ENV. #67042246

CITATION 2012

ISSUE CITATION; Comment: ESERVE- ENV. #67042246

CITATION 2012

ISSUE CITATION; Comment: ESERVE- ENV. #67042246

CITATION 2012

ISSUE CITATION; Comment: ESERVE- ENV. #67042246

CITATION 2012

ISSUE CITATION; Comment: ESERVE- ENV. #67042246

NOTICE OF NONSUIT

NOTICE - NONSUIT

RETURN OF SERVICE - GILBERTO ALLEN, JR

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - GILBERTO ALLEN, JR

RETURN OF SERVICE - KIMBERLY DENISE GHEEN

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - KIMBERLY DENISE GHEEN

ORDER - PARTIAL NONSUIT

ORDER - PARTIAL NONSUIT; Comment: WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO KAYSE LEIGH HAMPTON AND CLAYTON ALAN HAMPTON ONLY

ORIGINAL ANSWER

ORIGINAL ANSWER

JURY DEMAND

JURY DEMAND

AMENDED FIRST ANSWER

AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL; Comment: FIRST

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketDISMISSAL HEARING; Judicial Officer: MONTGOMERY, SALLY; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL; Comment: FIRST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJURY DEMAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketVACATION LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PARTIAL NONSUIT; Comment: WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO KAYSE LEIGH HAMPTON AND CLAYTON ALAN HAMPTON ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - KIMBERLY DENISE GHEEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - GILBERTO ALLEN, JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - NONSUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketCITATION (SERVICE); Served: 08/16/2022; Anticipated Server: ATTORNEY; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; ATTORNEY: Returned; 08/17/2022: Comment; GILBERTO OSVALDO ALLEN, JR.

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketCITATION (SERVICE); Unserved: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Comment: ASHLEY DEE VOSS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketCITATION (SERVICE); Served: 08/11/2022; Anticipated Server: ATTORNEY; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; ATTORNEY: Returned; 08/17/2022: Comment; KIMBERLY DENISE GHEEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for GARZA, AARON : STATE CREDIT; ; $137.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for GARZA, AARON : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (CC); Receipt # CV-2022-07519; GARZA, AARON $253.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for GARZA, AARON : Transaction Assessment; ; $390.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: GARZA, AARON ; Total Financial Assessment $390.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $390.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJURY DEMAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION; Comment: ESERVE- ENV. #67042246

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION, JURY DEMAND, AND RULE 193.7 NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Janet K. Colaneri