This case was last updated from Dallas County Texas Courts on 05/21/2022 at 16:44:03 (UTC).

TIMOTHY AZZELIO, JENNIFER AZZELIO vs. MICHAEL KENNEDY, SOUTHWESTERN BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY, INDIVIDUALLY AND D/B/A AT&T TEXAS, AT&T INC.

Case Summary

On 10/18/2013 TIMOTHY AZZELIO, JENNIFER AZZELIO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MICHAEL KENNEDY, SOUTHWESTERN BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY, INDIVIDUALLY AND D/B/A AT T TEXAS, AT T INC. This case was filed in Dallas County Texas Courts, Dallas County Texas Courts At Law located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is FIFER, KING. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********85-B

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

FIFER, KING

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AZZELIO, JENNIFER

AZZELIO, TIMOTHY

Defendants

KENNEDY, MICHAEL

SOUTHWESTERN BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY

INDIVIDUALLY AND D/B/A AT&T TEXAS

AT&T INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MURRAY, JAY JOSEPH

Defendant Attorneys

BURCHETT, ALTRESHA

MORRIS, JENNIFER

 

Court Documents

NOTICE

NON JURY TRIAL; Judicial Officer: FIFER, KING; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: BY COURT ADMINISTRATOR

CIVIL CASE INFORMATION SHEET

CIVIL CASE INFORMATION SHEET

Agreed Discovery Control Plan-signed.pdf

PROPOSED ORDER

MX-C311 - _20140805_164753.pdf

NOTICE - TAKE DEPOSITION

Filing letter DCP.pdf

CORRESPONDENCE; Comment: PROPOSED AGREED SCHEDULING ORDER

ORDER - DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION

ORDER - DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION

azzelio answer.pdf

ORIGINAL ANSWER

MX-C311 - _20140805_164907.pdf

NOTICE - TAKE DEPOSITION

MX-C311 - _20140805_164726.pdf

NOTICE - TAKE DEPOSITION

KENNEDY, MICHAEL - CITATION (SERVICE)

KENNEDY, MICHAEL - CITATION (SERVICE)

SOUTHWESTERN BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY - CITATION (SE

SOUTHWESTERN BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY - CITATION (SE

AT&T INC - CITATION (SERVICE)

AT&T INC - CITATION (SERVICE)

Reporter's Certificate Michael Kennedy Sept 12 2014.pdf

REPORTER CERTIFICATE; Comment: REPORTER'S CERTIFICATION ORAL DEPOSITION OF MICHAEL KENNEDY SEPTEMBER 12, 2014.

NOTICE

NON JURY TRIAL; Judicial Officer: FIFER, KING; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: BY COURT ADMINISTRATOR

NOTICE

NON JURY TRIAL; Judicial Officer: FIFER, KING; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: BY COURT ADMINISTRATOR

NOTICE

NON JURY TRIAL; Judicial Officer: FIFER, KING; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: BY COURT ADMINISTRATOR

NOTICE

NON JURY TRIAL; Judicial Officer: FIFER, KING; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: BY COURT ADMINISTRATOR

NOTICE

- DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; NOTICE: Comment; C/O JENNIFER MORRIS

61 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPORTER CERTIFICATE; Comment: REPORTER'S CERTIFICATION ORAL DEPOSITION OF MICHAEL KENNEDY SEPTEMBER 12, 2014.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON JURY TRIAL; Judicial Officer: FIFER, KING; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: BY COURT ADMINISTRATOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket- DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; NOTICE: Comment; C/O JENNIFER MORRIS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket- DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; NOTICE: Comment; C/O JAY JOSEPH MURRAY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION HEARING; Judicial Officer: FIFER, KING; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: 11-13-14 PER MEDIATOR CASE SETTLED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEDIATION - SETTLED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2014
  • DocketREPORTER CERTIFICATE; Comment: PERTAINING TO: TIMOTHY AZZELIO CUSTODIAN: TEXAS BACK INSTITUTE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2014
  • DocketREPORTER CERTIFICATE; Comment: PERTAINING TO: TIMOTHY AZZELIO CUSTODIAN: WEST PLANO INTERVENTION AND PROCEDURE CENTER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2014
  • DocketREPORTER CERTIFICATE; Comment: PERTAINING TO: TIMOTHY AZZELIO CUSTODIAN: METHODIST HOSPITAL FOR SURGERY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
46 More Docket Entries
  • 10/18/2013
  • FinancialFinancial:; AZZELIO, JENNIFER ; Total Financial Assessment $0.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2013
  • FinancialFinancial info for AZZELIO, TIMOTHY : PAYMENT (CASE FEES); Receipt # CV-2013-28022; MURRAY, JAY JOSEPH $274.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2013
  • FinancialFinancial info for AZZELIO, TIMOTHY : Transaction Assessment; ; $12.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2013
  • FinancialFinancial info for AZZELIO, TIMOTHY : Transaction Assessment; ; $262.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2013
  • FinancialFinancial: AZZELIO, TIMOTHY ; Total Financial Assessment $274.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $274.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2013
  • DocketCITATION (SERVICE); Served: 10/24/2013; Anticipated Server: ATTORNEY; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; OUT OF COUNTY: Returned; 10/24/2013: Served; 10/22/2013: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Actual Server: PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER; Returned: 10/23/2013; Served: 10/22/2013; Anticipated Server: ATTORNEY; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Returned; 10/23/2013

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE INFORMATION SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION; Comment: Made box for atty -- Jay J Murray

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION (OCA - NEW CASE FILED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less