This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 02/01/2023 at 10:59:15 (UTC).

THERESA STUMON vs. HSBC, et al

Case Summary

On 08/03/2018 THERESA STUMON filed an Other lawsuit against HSBC,. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is HOFFMAN, MARTIN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0279

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

HOFFMAN, MARTIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STUMON, THERESA

Defendants

MEEK, J

PATTON, LISLE

HSBC

BERRY, ELENORA

OLIVER, CHANCE

ANTWYNN, BERRY

Oliver, Leland C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

HYTKEN, RACHEL L

OLIVER, L. CHANCE

 

Court Documents

MANDATE DISMISS

MANDATE DISMISS

COA - CORRESPONDENCE LETTER

COA - CORRESPONDENCE LETTER

COA - CORRESPONDENCE LETTER

COA - CORRESPONDENCE LETTER

MISCELLANOUS EVENT

MISCELLANOUS EVENT; Comment: JUDGMENT

OPINION

OPINION

COA - POST CARD

COA - POST CARD; Comment: 05-19-01155-CV

APPELLATE RECORD

APPELLATE RECORD; Comment: 05-19-01155-CV SUBMIT 5THCOA W/CONFIRMATION #38514

COA - NO PAYMENT LETTER

COA - NO PAYMENT LETTER; Comment: 05-19-01155-CV SUBMIT 5THCOA W/CONFIRMATION #36961

68th Court-Non-Jury Trial Letter

Non Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: HOFFMAN, MARTIN; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED; Comment: 1ST TRL SETTING - MLD NTCS TO ALL PARTIES

68th Court-Non-Jury Trial Letter

Non Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: HOFFMAN, MARTIN; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED; Comment: 1ST TRL SETTING - MLD NTCS TO ALL PARTIES

68th Court-Non-Jury Trial Letter

Non Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: HOFFMAN, MARTIN; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED; Comment: 1ST TRL SETTING - MLD NTCS TO ALL PARTIES

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION

AMENDED PETITION

AMENDED PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION

83 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMANDATE DISMISS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOA - CORRESPONDENCE LETTER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOA - CORRESPONDENCE LETTER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMISCELLANEOUS EVENT; Comment: JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOPINION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOA - POST CARD; Comment: 05-19-01155-CV

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPELLATE RECORD; Comment: 05-19-01155-CV SUBMIT 5THCOA W/CONFIRMATION #38514

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for STUMON, THERESA : PAYMENT (CASE FEES); Receipt # 1851-2020-DCLK; STUMON, THERESA $977.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOA - NO PAYMENT LETTER; Comment: 05-19-01155-CV SUBMIT 5THCOA W/CONFIRMATION #36961

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: HOFFMAN, MARTIN; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED; Comment: 1ST TRL SETTING - MLD NTCS TO ALL PARTIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
73 More Docket Entries
  • 10/10/2018
  • DocketCITATION; Return Unserved: 10/25/2018; Anticipated Server: CONSTABLE 3; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; CONSTABLE 3: Returned; 10/25/2018: Comment; PCT 3/JH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • FinancialFinancial info for STUMON, THERESA : PAYMENT (CASE FEES); Receipt # 67315-2018-DCLK; STUMON, THERESA $440.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • FinancialFinancial info for STUMON, THERESA : Transaction Assessment; ; $440.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED PETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • FinancialFinancial info for STUMON, THERESA : PAYMENT (CASE FEES); Receipt # 50068-2018-DCLK; STUMON, THERESA $292.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • FinancialFinancial info for STUMON, THERESA : Transaction Assessment; ; $292.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • FinancialFinancial: STUMON, THERESA ; Total Financial Assessment $1,724.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $1,724.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less