This case was last updated from Dallas County Texas Courts on 06/02/2022 at 00:36:04 (UTC).

THE RICHARDS GROUP, INC. vs. RADICALMEDIA, LLC

Case Summary

On 08/29/2017 THE RICHARDS GROUP, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against RADICALMEDIA, LLC. This case was filed in Dallas County Texas Courts, Dallas County Texas Courts At Law located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is GREENBERG, MARK. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********63-E

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

GREENBERG, MARK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE RICHARDS GROUP, INC.

2801 North Central Expressway, Suite 100

Dallas, TX 75204

Defendant

RADICALMEDIA, LLC

435 Hudson St., Floor 6, New

York, NY 10014-3900

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WELTON, JAMIE

WELTON, JAMIE R

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFF S ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: PLAINTIFF S ORIGINAL PETITION

NOTICE OF NONSUIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE

NOTICE OF NONSUIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE; Comment: RADICALMEDIA, LLC

LETTER TO EXTEND DISMISSAL HEARING

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: LETTER REGARDING DISMISSAL HEARING

NOTICE OF NONSUIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE

NOTICE OF NONSUIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE; Comment: JAMIE WELTON

ORDER - NONSUIT DISMISSAL W/OUT PREJUDICE

ORDER - NONSUIT DISMISSAL W/OUT PREJUDICE

1 CCL#5 Y LETTER

DISMISSAL HEARING; Judicial Officer: GREENBERG, MARK; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: REQUESTED BY ATTORNEY/PRO SE

CIVIL CASE INFORMATION SHEET

CIVIL CASE INFORMATION SHEET; Comment: CIVIL CASE INFORMATION SHEET

PROPOSED ORDER

NOTICE - NONSUIT; Comment: WITH PROPOSED ORDER

NOTICE OF NONSUIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE

NOTICE - NONSUIT; Comment: WITH PROPOSED ORDER

1 CCL#5 Y LETTER

DISMISSAL HEARING; Judicial Officer: GREENBERG, MARK; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: REQUESTED BY ATTORNEY/PRO SE

NOTICE OF NONSUIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE

NOTICE OF NONSUIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE; Comment: RADICALMEDIA, LLC

NOTICE OF NONSUIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE

NOTICE OF NONSUIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE; Comment: JAMIE WELTON

ORDER - NONSUIT DISMISSAL W/OUT PREJUDICE

ORDER - NONSUIT DISMISSAL W/OUT PREJUDICE

NOTICE OF NONSUIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE

NOTICE - NONSUIT; Comment: WITH PROPOSED ORDER

PROPOSED ORDER

NOTICE - NONSUIT; Comment: WITH PROPOSED ORDER

1 CCL#5 Y LETTER

DISMISSAL HEARING; Judicial Officer: GREENBERG, MARK; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: REQUESTED BY ATTORNEY/PRO SE

LETTER TO EXTEND DISMISSAL HEARING

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: LETTER REGARDING DISMISSAL HEARING

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL HEARING; Judicial Officer: GREENBERG, MARK; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: REQUESTED BY ATTORNEY/PRO SE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF NONSUIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE; Comment: RADICALMEDIA, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF NONSUIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE; Comment: JAMIE WELTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NONSUIT DISMISSAL W/OUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - NONSUIT; Comment: WITH PROPOSED ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL HEARING; Judicial Officer: GREENBERG, MARK; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: REQUESTED BY ATTORNEY/PRO SE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: LETTER REGARDING DISMISSAL HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • DocketCITATION (SERVICE); Unserved: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Comment: ATTY PICKUP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • FinancialFinancial info for THE RICHARDS GROUP, INC. : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (CC); Receipt # CV-2017-11446; THE RICHARDS GROUP, INC. $296.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • FinancialFinancial info for THE RICHARDS GROUP, INC. : Transaction Assessment; ; $296.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • FinancialFinancial: THE RICHARDS GROUP, INC. ; Total Financial Assessment $296.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $296.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE INFORMATION SHEET; Comment: CIVIL CASE INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: PLAINTIFF S ORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE RICHARDS GROUP, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where RADICALMEDIA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WELTON, JAMIE