This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 06/02/2022 at 23:00:40 (UTC).

STARTEKK, LLC vs. DAO JENSEN, et al

Case Summary

On 07/10/2020 STARTEKK, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DAO JENSEN. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAMS, STACI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9474

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAMS, STACI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STARTEKK, LLC

Defendants

KAIZEN TECHNOLOGY PARTNERS

236 West Portal Avenue, San

Francisco, CA 94127

JENSEN, DAO

Francisco, CA 94127

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ALTICK, MATTHEW J.

Defendant Attorney

ARMSTRONG, RICHARD L

 

Court Documents

101st Dismissal - Settled

101st Dismissal - Settled

101st J/NJ Trial Notice 2021

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, STACI; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

EXECUTED CITATION - DAO JENSEN

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - DAO JENSEN

101st Dismissal - Settled

101st Dismissal - Settled

101st Dismissal - Settled

101st Dismissal - Settled

101st J/NJ Trial Notice 2021

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, STACI; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE TRIAL RESET

101st J/NJ Trial Notice 2021

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, STACI; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE TRIAL RESET

ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE S

ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE; Comment: SECOND JOINT

RULE 11 AGREEMENT WITHDRAW WRITTEN DISCOVERY REQUESTS

RULE 11; Comment: AGREEMENT WITHDRAW WRITTEN DISCOVERY REQUESTS

ORIGINAL ANSWER

- GENERAL DENIAL; ORIGINAL ANSWER

SCHEDULING ORDER LEVEL 3

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: SCHEDULING ORDER LEVEL 3

DEFENDANTS THIRD AMENDED ORIGINAL ANSWER AND FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL COUNTERCLAIM

AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL; Comment: THIRD

ORDER - LEVEL 3 DISCOVERY CONTROL PLAN

ORDER - MISC.; Comment: LEVEL 3 DISCOVERY CONTROL PLAN

71 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, STACI; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket- GENERAL DENIAL; ORIGINAL ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: SCHEDULING ORDER LEVEL 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL; Comment: THIRD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - MISC.; Comment: LEVEL 3 DISCOVERY CONTROL PLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, STACI; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE TRIAL RESET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE; Comment: SECOND JOINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRULE 11; Comment: AGREEMENT WITHDRAW WRITTEN DISCOVERY REQUESTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED SECOND JOINT ORDER TO CONTINUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - CONTINUANCE; Comment: SECOND JOINT

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketCITATION; Served: 08/03/2020; Anticipated Server: CERTIFIED MAIL; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; CERTIFIED MAIL: Returned; 10/09/2020: Comment; KAIZEN TECHNOLOGY PARTNERS//9214 8901 0661 5400 0153 0256 59

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for STARTEKK, LLC : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 44284-2020-DCLK; STARTEKK, LLC $16.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for STARTEKK, LLC : Transaction Assessment; ; $16.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFOR SERVICE; REQUEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for STARTEKK, LLC : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 40742-2020-DCLK; STARTEKK, LLC $452.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for STARTEKK, LLC : Transaction Assessment; ; $452.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: STARTEKK, LLC ; Total Financial Assessment $468.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $468.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard L Armstrong