This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 06/12/2022 at 12:49:36 (UTC).

STAMATINA HOLDINGS LLC, et al vs. CITY OF DALLAS, et al

Case Summary

On 09/17/2020 STAMATINA HOLDINGS LLC filed an Other lawsuit against CITY OF DALLAS. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are WILLIAMS, STACI and WHITMORE, BRIDGETT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3349

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

WILLIAMS, STACI

WHITMORE, BRIDGETT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TENANTS OF 1918 DULUTH STREET, DALLAS, TEXAS 75212

STAMATINA HOLDINS LLC

STAMATINA HOLDINGS LLC

C/O Angelos Kolobotos, 4848 Lemmon Ave #405

Dallas, TX 75219

Defendants

CITY SECRETARY'S OFFICE

CITY OF DALLAS

Dallas, TX 75201

CITY SECRETARY OFFICE

1500 Marilla Street, #5Ds

Dallas, TX 75201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CLARK, STEVEN EUGENE

ALTICK, MATTHEW J.

ADAMS, LESLIE WILLIAM

Defendant Attorneys

MOORE, PAUL

ROY, JUSTIN H

GILBERT, ANDREW M

PAUR, KYLE F

AKINS, CHANLOR K

CABRERA, BRYANT F

 

Court Documents

3RD EMERGENCY MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE

MOTION - CONTINUANCE; Comment: 3RD EMERGENCY

4TH INTERIM REPORT OF RECEIVER

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: 4TH INTERIM REPORT OF RECEIVER

193rd Jury Trial Notice Whitmore

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: WHITMORE, BRIDGETT; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

193rd Jury Trial Notice Whitmore

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: WHITMORE, BRIDGETT; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

193rd Jury Trial Notice Whitmore

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: WHITMORE, BRIDGETT; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

193rd Jury Trial Notice Whitmore

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: WHITMORE, BRIDGETT; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

193rd Jury Trial Notice Whitmore

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: WHITMORE, BRIDGETT; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

BRIEF FILED

BRIEF FILED

SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF

BRIEF FILED; Comment: SUPPLEMENTAL

ORDER DENYING RECEIVER'S MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF SALE

MOTION HEARING; Judicial Officer: WHITMORE, BRIDGETT; Hearing Time: 02:00 PM; Comment: VIA ZOOM * SET BYCRISTINA 214-948-8333

RESPONSE TO RECEIVER'S MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF SALE

RESPONSE; Comment: TO RECEIVER'S MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF SALE

NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION TO APPROVE SALE

NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT; Comment: ON MOTION TO APPROVE SALE

PROPOSED ORDER TO APPROVE SALE OF REAL PROPERTY

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: APPROVING OF SALE OF REAL PROPERTY

RECEIVER'S MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF SALE OF REAL PROPERTY

MOTION - MISCELLANOUS; Comment: RECEIVER'S MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF SALE OF REAL PROPERTY

ISSUE CITATION - CITY OF DALLAS

ISSUE CITATION; Comment: FIRST AMENDED

CASE FILING COVER SHEET

CASE FILING COVER SHEET

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION

371 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: WHITMORE, BRIDGETT; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - CONTEMPT; Comment: 3RD EMERGENCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Comment: 4TH INTERIM REPORT OF RECEIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - DENY; Comment: RECEIVER'S MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF SALE OF REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEF FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEF FILED; Comment: SUPPLEMENTAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION HEARING; Judicial Officer: WHITMORE, BRIDGETT; Hearing Time: 02:00 PM; Comment: VIA ZOOM * SET BYCRISTINA 214-948-8333

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: ORDER DENYING RECEIVER'S MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE; Comment: TO RECEIVER'S MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT; Comment: ON MOTION TO APPROVE SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
209 More Docket Entries
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION; Comment: FIRST AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketCITATION; Return Unserved: 09/29/2020; Anticipated Server: CONSTABLE 1; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; CONSTABLE 1: Returned; 09/29/2020: Comment; CITY SECRETARY OFFICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for STAMATINA HOLDINGS LLC : PAYMENT (CASE FEES); Receipt # 57448-2020-DCLK; ANGELOS KOLOMBOTOS $380.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for STAMATINA HOLDINGS LLC : Transaction Assessment; ; $88.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for STAMATINA HOLDINGS LLC : Transaction Assessment; ; $292.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: STAMATINA HOLDINGS LLC ; Total Financial Assessment $598.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $598.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE FILING COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TENANTS OF 1918 DULUTH STREET, DALLAS, TEXAS 75212 is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY SECRETARY'S OFFICE is a litigant

Latest cases where STAMATINA HOLDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROY, JUSTIN H