This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 09/26/2022 at 13:06:56 (UTC).

Regina Eaves, et al vs. Ashland, Inc, et al

Case Summary

On 10/04/2017 Regina Eaves, filed an Other lawsuit against Ashland, Inc,. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are PARKER, TONYA and PARKER, TONYA, PARKER, TONYA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3688

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

PARKER, TONYA

PARKER, TONYA, PARKER, TONYA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Eaves, Regina

Eaves, Dustin

Eaves, Cody

Defendants

Union Oil Company of California

Shell Oil Company Inc

Ashland, Inc

Unocal Corporation Foremerly known as Union Oil Company

Chevron Corporation

 

Court Documents

DISMISSED FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION

Disposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer; PARKER, TONYA; Judgment Type; DISMISSED FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION

301225 signd ccs.pdf

ORIGINAL PETITION

DC17-13688.pdf

CITATION ISSUED

DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION

DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer(s): PARKER, TONYA, PARKER, TONYA; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: HEARING HELD; Comment: COUNSEL GIVEN ADMIN # TO APPEAR BY PHONE

DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION

DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer(s): PARKER, TONYA, PARKER, TONYA; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: COUNSEL TO APPEAR BY PHONE

DISMISSED FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION

Disposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer; PARKER, TONYA; Judgment Type; DISMISSED FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION

301225 signd ccs.pdf

ORIGINAL PETITION

DC17-13688.pdf

CITATION ISSUED

DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION

DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer(s): PARKER, TONYA, PARKER, TONYA; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: HEARING HELD; Comment: COUNSEL GIVEN ADMIN # TO APPEAR BY PHONE

DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION

DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer(s): PARKER, TONYA, PARKER, TONYA; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: COUNSEL TO APPEAR BY PHONE

DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION

DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer: PARKER, TONYA; Judgment Type: DISMISSED FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer(s): PARKER, TONYA, PARKER, TONYA; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: COUNSEL TO APPEAR BY PHONE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer(s): PARKER, TONYA, PARKER, TONYA; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: HEARING HELD; Comment: COUNSEL GIVEN ADMIN # TO APPEAR BY PHONE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • DocketSUBPOENA DUCES TECUM; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ESERVE: Anticipated Method

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCITATION ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • FinancialFinancial info for Shell Oil Company Inc : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 65272-2017-DCLK; Shell Oil Company Inc $300.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • FinancialFinancial info for Shell Oil Company Inc : Transaction Assessment; ; $300.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • FinancialFinancial: Shell Oil Company Inc ; Total Financial Assessment $300.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $300.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • DocketISSUE SUBPOENA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less