This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 09/16/2022 at 23:02:27 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO FINANCIAL SERVICING COMPANY vs. PERFORMANCE PRINTING CORPORATION, et al

Case Summary

On 05/20/2010 PORTFOLIO FINANCIAL SERVICING COMPANY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PERFORMANCE PRINTING CORPORATION. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is TILLERY, DALE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6100

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

TILLERY, DALE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO FINANCIAL SERVICING COMPANY

Defendants

PUMPELLY, WILFRED C.

Dallas, TX 75241

PERFORMANCE PRINTING CORPORATION

2929 Stemmons Frwy.

Dallas, TX 75241

WHITE, JOHN T.

Dallas, TX 75241

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KNEBEL, ROBERT L

Defendant Attorney

MARINO, ASHLEY E

 

Court Documents

07-12-2010 - Scheduling Order - DC Civ M - DC1006100 - 108 - 2127105.pdf

SCHEDULING ORDER

02-14-2011 - Certificate of Deposition CV - DC1006100 - 3334406.pdf

CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION; Comment: STEVE EUSTICE

05-20-2010 - Original Petition (OCA) CV - DC1006100 - 1907099.pdf

ORIGINAL PETITION (OCA)

07-12-2010 - Order - Mediation - DC Civ M - DC1006100 - 116 - 2141582.pdf

ORDER - MEDIATION

11-30-2010 - Notice of Appearance CV - DC1006100 - 2904051.pdf

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

6-18-2010 - Original Answer - General Denial CV - DC1006100 - 2013680.pdf

ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

07-12-2010 - Notice of Trial CV - DC1006100 - 2119027.pdf

07-12-2010 - Notice of Trial CV - DC1006100 - 2119027.pdf

02-07-2011 - Notice of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution CV - DC1006100 - 3280783.pdf

02-07-2011 - Notice of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution CV - DC1006100 - 3280783.pdf

02-08-2011 - Notice of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution CV - DC1006100 - 3281528.pdf

02-08-2011 - Notice of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution CV - DC1006100 - 3281528.pdf

06-07-2010 - Return of Service CV - DC1006100 - 1977448.pdf

06-07-2010 - Return of Service CV - DC1006100 - 1977448.pdf

06-07-2010 - Return of Service CV - DC1006100 - 1977449.pdf

06-07-2010 - Return of Service CV - DC1006100 - 1977449.pdf

06-07-2010 - Return of Service CV - DC1006100 - 1977451.pdf

06-07-2010 - Return of Service CV - DC1006100 - 1977451.pdf

02-17-2011 - Correspondence - Letter to File CV - DC1006100 - 3357750.pdf

02-17-2011 - Correspondence - Letter to File CV - DC1006100 - 3357750.pdf

02-21-2011 - Order - Dismissal - DC Civ M - DC1006100 - 319 - 3449093.pdf

02-21-2011 - Order - Dismissal - DC Civ M - DC1006100 - 319 - 3449093.pdf

02-14-2011 - Certificate of Deposition CV - DC1006100 - 3334406.pdf

CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION; Comment: STEVE EUSTICE

11-30-2010 - Notice of Appearance CV - DC1006100 - 2904051.pdf

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

07-12-2010 - Order - Mediation - DC Civ M - DC1006100 - 116 - 2141582.pdf

ORDER - MEDIATION

07-12-2010 - Scheduling Order - DC Civ M - DC1006100 - 108 - 2127105.pdf

SCHEDULING ORDER

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2011
  • DocketFinal Disposition Hearing; Judicial Officer: TILLERY, DALE; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: BY COURT ADMINISTRATOR; Comment: Agreed Dismissal Order - F Ly

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2011
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer: TILLERY, DALE; Judgment Type: NON-SUIT/DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF / PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2011
  • DocketNOTE - CLERKS; Comment: SUBMITTED AGRD DISMISSAL ORDER*ADMIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION; Comment: STEVE EUSTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2011
  • DocketTRIAL SETTING (NON JURY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2011
  • DocketNon Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: TILLERY, DALE; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: BY COURT ADMINISTRATOR; Comment: Case Settled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2010
  • FinancialFinancial info for PERFORMANCE PRINTING CORPORATION : PAYMENT (CASE FEES); Receipt # 107897-2010-DCLK; BROWN MC - DALLAS $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2010
  • FinancialFinancial info for PERFORMANCE PRINTING CORPORATION : Transaction Assessment; ; $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 06/07/2010
  • FinancialFinancial info for PORTFOLIO FINANCIAL SERVICING COMPANY : Transaction Assessment; ; $140.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2010
  • FinancialFinancial info for PORTFOLIO FINANCIAL SERVICING COMPANY : Transaction Assessment; ; $70.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2010
  • DocketCITATION; Served: 05/26/2010; Anticipated Server: CONSTABLE 5; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; CONSTABLE 5: Returned; 06/07/2010: Served; 05/26/2010: Anticipated Server; CONSTABLE 5: Anticipated Method; Actual Server: CONSTABLE 5; Returned: 06/07/2010; Served: 05/26/2010; Anticipated Server: CONSTABLE 5; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; CONSTABLE 5: Returned; 06/07/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2010
  • DocketCASE FILING COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2010
  • FinancialFinancial info for PORTFOLIO FINANCIAL SERVICING COMPANY : PAYMENT (CASE FEES); Receipt # 43208-2010-DCLK; FERNANDEZ LLP $481.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2010
  • FinancialFinancial info for PORTFOLIO FINANCIAL SERVICING COMPANY : Transaction Assessment; ; $234.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2010
  • FinancialFinancial info for PORTFOLIO FINANCIAL SERVICING COMPANY : Transaction Assessment; ; $247.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2010
  • FinancialFinancial: PORTFOLIO FINANCIAL SERVICING COMPANY ; Total Financial Assessment $481.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $481.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2010
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PERFORMANCE PRINTING CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARINO, ASHLEY E