This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 04/15/2022 at 16:39:08 (UTC).

PERFORMANCE PRINTING CORPORATION vs. AGFA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 03/03/2011 PERFORMANCE PRINTING CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against AGFA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is RAGGIO, LORRAINE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2347

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

RAGGIO, LORRAINE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PERFORMANCE PRINTING CORPORATION

Defendant

AGFA CORPORATION

350 N. St. Paul Street, Suite 2900

Dallas, TX 75201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARINO, ASHLEY E

 

Court Documents

12-16-2011 - Motion - Dismiss CV - DC1102347 - 6568965.pdf

MOTION - DISMISS

11-10-2011 - Correspondence - Letter to File CV - DC1102347 - 6183137.pdf

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE

09-07-2011 - Correspondence - Letter to File CV - DC1102347 - 5365736.pdf

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE

03-03-2011 - Original Petition (OCA) CV - DC1102347 - 3528384.pdf

ORIGINAL PETITION (OCA)

03-09-2011 - Verification - DC Civ P - DC1102347 - 3544211.pdf

VERIFICATION; Comment: PLTF

03-14-2011 - Notice of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution CV - DC1102347 - 3575572.pdf

03-14-2011 - Notice of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution CV - DC1102347 - 3575572.pdf

05-12-2011 - Notice of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution CV - DC1102347 - 4163375.pdf

05-12-2011 - Notice of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution CV - DC1102347 - 4163375.pdf

07-13-2011 - Notice of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution CV - DC1102347 - 4710754.pdf

07-13-2011 - Notice of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution CV - DC1102347 - 4710754.pdf

11-10-2011 - Notice of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution CV - DC1102347 - 6177851.pdf

11-10-2011 - Notice of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution CV - DC1102347 - 6177851.pdf

03-11-2011 - Return of Service CV - DC1102347 - 3615980.pdf

03-11-2011 - Return of Service CV - DC1102347 - 3615980.pdf

07-08-2011 - Settled - DC Civ P - DC1102347 - 4715679.pdf

07-08-2011 - Settled - DC Civ P - DC1102347 - 4715679.pdf

03-03-2011 - Case Filing Cover Sheet CV - DC1102347 - 3528264.pdf

03-03-2011 - Case Filing Cover Sheet CV - DC1102347 - 3528264.pdf

03-03-2011 - Case Filing Cover Sheet CV - DC1102347 - 3528265.pdf

03-03-2011 - Case Filing Cover Sheet CV - DC1102347 - 3528265.pdf

05-11-2011 - Correspondence - Letter to File CV - DC1102347 - 4163389.pdf

05-11-2011 - Correspondence - Letter to File CV - DC1102347 - 4163389.pdf

12-19-2011 - Order - Dismissal - DC Civ M - DC1102347 - 973 - 6593301.pdf

12-19-2011 - Order - Dismissal - DC Civ M - DC1102347 - 973 - 6593301.pdf

12-16-2011 - Motion - Dismiss CV - DC1102347 - 6568965.pdf

MOTION - DISMISS

11-10-2011 - Correspondence - Letter to File CV - DC1102347 - 6183137.pdf

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE

09-07-2011 - Correspondence - Letter to File CV - DC1102347 - 5365736.pdf

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2012
  • DocketFinal Disposition Hearing; Judicial Officer: RAGGIO, LORRAINE; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: BY COURT ADMINISTRATOR; Comment: ORDER DISM SUBMITTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2011
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer: RAGGIO, LORRAINE; Judgment Type: NON-SUIT/DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF / PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2011
  • DocketNOTE - ADMINISTRATOR; Comment: ORDER OF DISM W/PREJ SIGNED 12-19-2011. ORIG/CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2011
  • DocketNOTE - ADMINISTRATOR; Comment: ORDER DISMISS SUBMITTED TO JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2011
  • DocketNOTE - CLERKS; Comment: ORDER DISMISS SUBMITTED TO ADMIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2011
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVERIFICATION; Comment: PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2011
  • DocketCITATION; Served: 03/10/2011; Anticipated Server: MAIL; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Returned; 03/11/2011: Comment; - MAIL ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2011
  • FinancialFinancial info for PERFORMANCE PRINTING CORPORATION : PAYMENT (CASE FEES); Receipt # 14497-2011-DCLK; MCGUIRE CRADDOCK & STROTHER PC $255.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2011
  • FinancialFinancial info for PERFORMANCE PRINTING CORPORATION : Transaction Assessment; ; $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2011
  • FinancialFinancial info for PERFORMANCE PRINTING CORPORATION : Transaction Assessment; ; $247.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2011
  • FinancialFinancial: PERFORMANCE PRINTING CORPORATION ; Total Financial Assessment $255.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $255.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2011
  • DocketCASE FILING COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2011
  • DocketCASE FILING COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2011
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PERFORMANCE PRINTING CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where AGFA Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARINO, ASHLEY E