This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 06/02/2022 at 11:11:08 (UTC).

OMAR BALBOA vs. A&L HOT OIL SERVICES INC, et al

Case Summary

On 05/15/2020 OMAR BALBOA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against A L HOT OIL SERVICES INC,. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are MOORE, MARICELA and WILLIAMS, KRISTINA M. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6888

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

MOORE, MARICELA

WILLIAMS, KRISTINA M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BALBOA, OMAR

Freer, TX 78357

Defendants

EAGLE PCO, LLC

FORBES ENERGY SERVICES LTD

CC FORBES, LLC

FORBES ENERGY SERVICES LLC

CHESAPEAKE OPERATING, LLC

SDS PETROLEUM CONSULTANTS, LLC

CHESAPEAKE ENERGY CORPORATION

A&L HOT OIL SERVICES INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MILLER, MICHAEL SIDNEY

Defendant Attorneys

STREICH, MICHAEL EDWARD

CILFONE, CHARLES J

NORRIS, JOSHUA A

FIELDS, CHARLOTTE A

ZITO, NICHOLAS E

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION BY WRITTEN QUESTIONS - DR. VELA VELA-TRUJILLO (MEDICAL

CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION; Comment: CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION BY WRITTEN QUESTIONS - DR. VELA VELA-TRUJILLO (MEDICAL)

CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSIITION-JIM WELLS COUNTY CHIROPRACTIC-MEDICAL(OMAR BALBOA)

CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION; Comment: JIM WELLS COUNTY CHIROPRACTIC-MEDICAL (OMAR BALBOA)

CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION-JIM WELLS COUNTY CHIROPRACTIC-MEDICAL-(OMAR BALBOA)

CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION; Comment: JIM WELLS COUNTY CHIROPRACTIC-MEDICAL (OMAR BALBOA)

NOTICE OF SUBPEONA & DEPO BY WRITTEN QUESTIONS DR. VELA VELA-TRUJILLO

DISCOVERY; Comment: NOTICE OF SUBPOENA AND DEPOSITION BY WRITTEN QUESTIONS 0F DR. VELA VELA-TRUJILLO

NOTICE OF SUBPEONA & DEPO BY WRITTEN QUESTION DR. VELA VELA-TRUJILLO

DISCOVERY; Comment: NOTICE OF SUBPOENA AND DEPOSITION BY WRITTEN QUESTIONS 0F DR. VELA VELA-TRUJILLO

NOTICE OD SUBPOENA & DEPO WRITTEN QUESTIONS JIM WELLS COUNTY CHIROPRACTIC

DISCOVERY; Comment: NOTICE OF SUBPOENA AND DEPOSITION BY WRITTEN QUESTIONS 0F JIM WELLS COUNTY CHIROPRACTIC

NOTICE OF SUBPEONA & DEPO WRITTEN QUESTION-JIM WELLS COUNTY CHIROPRACTIC

DISCOVERY; Comment: NOTICE OF SUBPOENA AND DEPOSITION BY WRITTEN QUESTIONS 0F JIM WELLS COUNTY CHIROPRACTIC

192nd Trial Reset Letter Tenesa

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, KRISTINA M; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: BY COURT ADMINISTRATOR

192nd Trial Reset Letter Tenesa

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, KRISTINA M; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: BY COURT ADMINISTRATOR

ISSUE CITATION - 8. EAGLE PCO, LLC

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION - 7. CC FORBES, LLC

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION - 6. FORBES ENERGY SERVICES, LLC

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION - 5. FORBES ENERGY SERVICES, LTD

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION - 4. A&L HOT OIL SERVICE, INC.

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION - 3. SDS PETROLEUM CONSULTANTS, LLC

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION - 2. CHESAPEAKE ENERGY CORPORATION

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION - 1. CHESAPEAKE OPERATING, LLC

ISSUE CITATION

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION

69 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2030
  • DocketNOTE - ADMINISTRATOR; Comment: *******************THIS IS A MDL CASE****************

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION; Comment: CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION BY WRITTEN QUESTIONS - DR. VELA VELA-TRUJILLO (MEDICAL)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION; Comment: JIM WELLS COUNTY CHIROPRACTIC-MEDICAL (OMAR BALBOA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION; Comment: JIM WELLS COUNTY CHIROPRACTIC-MEDICAL (OMAR BALBOA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISCOVERY; Comment: NOTICE OF SUBPOENA AND DEPOSITION BY WRITTEN QUESTIONS 0F DR. VELA VELA-TRUJILLO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISCOVERY; Comment: NOTICE OF SUBPOENA AND DEPOSITION BY WRITTEN QUESTIONS 0F DR. VELA VELA-TRUJILLO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISCOVERY; Comment: NOTICE OF SUBPOENA AND DEPOSITION BY WRITTEN QUESTIONS 0F JIM WELLS COUNTY CHIROPRACTIC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISCOVERY; Comment: NOTICE OF SUBPOENA AND DEPOSITION BY WRITTEN QUESTIONS 0F JIM WELLS COUNTY CHIROPRACTIC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, KRISTINA M; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: BY COURT ADMINISTRATOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketJury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, KRISTINA M; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketCITATION; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ESERVE: Anticipated Method; Comment: A&L HOT OIL SERVICE, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketCITATION; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ESERVE: Anticipated Method; Comment: SDS PETROLEUM CONSULTANTS, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketCITATION; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ESERVE: Anticipated Method; Comment: CHESAPEAKE ENERGY CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketCITATION; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ESERVE: Anticipated Method; Comment: CHESAPEAKE OPERATING L.L.C.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for BALBOA, OMAR : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 28851-2020-DCLK; BALBOA, OMAR $292.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for BALBOA, OMAR : Transaction Assessment; ; $292.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: BALBOA, OMAR ; Total Financial Assessment $292.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $292.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CC FORBES, LLC is a litigant