This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 06/02/2022 at 10:52:11 (UTC).

NORMA MALDONADO vs. CHESAPEAKE OPERATING LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 05/14/2020 NORMA MALDONADO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CHESAPEAKE OPERATING LLC. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is MOORE, MARICELA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6809

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

MOORE, MARICELA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MALDONADO, NORMA LYN

Antonio, TX 78260

Defendants

C.C. FORBES LLC

C/O Plunkett, Griesenbeck, & Mimari, Inc., 1635 N.E. Loop 410, Suite 900

Antonio, TX 78209

FORBES ENERGY SERVICES LTD

C/O Plunkett, Griesenbeck, & Mimari, Inc., 1635 Ne Loop 410, Suite 900

Antonio, TX 78209

EAGLE PCO LLC

C/O Phelps Dunbar, Llp, 500 Dallas St., Suite 1300

Houston, TX 77002

A&L HOT OIL SERVICE INC.

C/O Ramey, Chandler, Quinn, & Zito, P.C., 750 Bering Dr., Suite 600

Houston, TX 77057

SDS PETROLEUM CONSULTANTS LLC

C/O Gieger, Laborde, Laperhouse, Llc, 5151 San Felipe, Suite 750

Houston, TX 77056

FORBES ENERGY SERVICES LLC

C/O Plunkett, Griesenbeck, & Mimari, Inc., 1635 N.E. Loop 410, Suite 900

Antonio, TX 78209

CHESAPEAKE ENERGY CORPORATION

C/O Jones Walker, 811 Main St., Suite 2900

Houston, TX 77002

CHESAPEAKE OPERATING LLC

C/O Jones Walker, 811 Main St., Suite 2900

Houston, TX 77002

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ALVAREZ, OMAR G.

GUTIERREZ, BALDEMAR F

Defendant Attorneys

CILFONE, CHARLES J

STREICH, MICHAEL EDWARD

ZITO, NICHOLAS E

FIELDS, CHARLOTTE A

NORRIS, JOSHUA A

 

Court Documents

MALDONADO NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY

NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY

NOTICE OF INTENTION

DISCOVERY; Comment: NOTICE OF INTENTION

RE RECORDS

RULE 11; Comment: RE RECORDS

MDL ORDER REINSTATE

MISCELLANOUS EVENT; Comment: MDL ORDER ISSUED 04/07/2021

ORIGINAL ANSWER

- GENERAL DENIAL; ORIGINAL ANSWER

PLTF/MOTION TO COMPEL

MOTION - COMPEL; Comment: DEFENDANTS FORBES ENERGY SERVICES. LTD., FORBES ENERGY SERVICES, L.L.C., AND CC FORBES, L.L.C.'S TO RESPOND TO INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

162nd Cover Letter

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: MOORE, MARICELA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

162nd Cover Letter

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: MOORE, MARICELA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

162nd Cover Letter

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: MOORE, MARICELA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

162nd Cover Letter

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: MOORE, MARICELA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED

162nd Cover Letter

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: MOORE, MARICELA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED

162nd Cover Letter

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: MOORE, MARICELA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED

162nd Cover Letter

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: MOORE, MARICELA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED

162nd Cover Letter

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: MOORE, MARICELA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED

162nd Cover Letter

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: MOORE, MARICELA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED

162nd Cover Letter

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: MOORE, MARICELA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED

RE RECORDS

RULE 11; Comment: RE RECORDS

MDL ORDER REINSTATE

MISCELLANOUS EVENT; Comment: MDL ORDER ISSUED 04/07/2021

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: MOORE, MARICELA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRULE 11; Comment: RE RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketVACATION LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketINACTIVATE CASE (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketREACTIVATE CASE (OCA); Comment: MDL ORDER REINSTATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMISCELLANOUS EVENT; Comment: MDL ORDER ISSUED 04/07/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISCOVERY; Comment: NOTICE OF INTENTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketMotion - Compel; Judicial Officer: MOORE, MARICELA; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Cancel Reason: REQUESTED BY ATTORNEY/PRO SE; Comment: ZOOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMISCELLANOUS EVENT; Comment: MDL ORDER ISSUED 7/20/20

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 05/22/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for A&L HOT OIL SERVICE INC. : Transaction Assessment; ; $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: A&L HOT OIL SERVICE INC. ; Total Financial Assessment $40.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJURY DEMAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for MALDONADO, NORMA LYN : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 28563-2020-DCLK; MALDONADO, NORMA LYN $332.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for MALDONADO, NORMA LYN : Transaction Assessment; ; $332.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: MALDONADO, NORMA LYN ; Total Financial Assessment $332.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $332.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketJURY DEMAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CC FORBES, LLC is a litigant