This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 05/23/2022 at 02:45:14 (UTC).

ND AUTO SALES, LLC vs. REAGOR AUTO MALL, LTD.

Case Summary

On 10/19/2018 ND AUTO SALES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against REAGOR AUTO MALL, LTD. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is HOFFMAN, MARTIN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5859

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

HOFFMAN, MARTIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ND AUTO SALES, LLC

NET DIRECT AUTO SALES

Defendants

REAGOR AUTO MALL, LTD.

REAGOR DYKES DIRECT AUTO OF DALLAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

PAREKH, NEAL N

HENKE, LARRY E

 

Court Documents

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION

CITATION - REAGOR AUTO MALL LTD

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: CITATION - REAGOR AUTO MALL LTD

ALL OTHER DISPOSITIONS

Disposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer; HOFFMAN, MARTIN; Judgment Type; ALL OTHER DISPOSITIONS; Judgment; Total Judgment:; of $0.00; Awarded To:; REAGOR AUTO MALL, LTD.; Awarded Against:; ND AUTO SALES, LLC

CASE INFO

CASE FILING COVER SHEET

PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION

CITATION - REAGOR AUTO MALL LTD

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: CITATION - REAGOR AUTO MALL LTD

2019.03.13 Notice of Bankruptcy of Def Reagor Auto Mall Ltd.pdf

NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY; Comment: NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY OF DEFENDANT REAGOR AUTO MALL, LTD. d/b/a REAGOR DYKES DIRECT AUTO OF DALLAS

Dismissal Notice

DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: HOFFMAN, MARTIN; Hearing Time: 8:58 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED; Comment: 1ST SETTING ON DWOP -DEFT HAS BEEN SERVD MLD NTC TO PLT ATTY

Dismissal Notice

DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: HOFFMAN, MARTIN; Hearing Time: 8:58 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED; Comment: 1ST SETTING ON DWOP -DEFT HAS BEEN SERVD MLD NTC TO PLT ATTY

Dismissal Notice

DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: HOFFMAN, MARTIN; Hearing Time: 8:58 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED; Comment: 1ST SETTING ON DWOP -DEFT HAS BEEN SERVD MLD NTC TO PLT ATTY

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: HOFFMAN, MARTIN; Hearing Time: 8:58 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED; Comment: 1ST SETTING ON DWOP -DEFT HAS BEEN SERVD MLD NTC TO PLT ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketNOTE - ADMINISTRATOR; Comment: FWD SIGNED ORDER TO ABATE TO CLERKS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer: HOFFMAN, MARTIN; Judgment Type: ALL OTHER DISPOSITIONS; Judgment: Total Judgment:; of $0.00: Awarded To:; REAGOR AUTO MALL, LTD.: Awarded Against:; ND AUTO SALES, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY; Comment: NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY OF DEFENDANT REAGOR AUTO MALL, LTD. d/b/a REAGOR DYKES DIRECT AUTO OF DALLAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: CITATION - REAGOR AUTO MALL LTD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • FinancialFinancial info for ND AUTO SALES, LLC : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 69755-2018-DCLK; ND AUTO SALES, LLC $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • FinancialFinancial info for ND AUTO SALES, LLC : Transaction Assessment; ; $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • FinancialFinancial: ND AUTO SALES, LLC ; Total Financial Assessment $300.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • DocketCITATION; Served: 10/29/2018; Anticipated Server: ESERVE; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; OUT OF COUNTY: Returned; 11/01/2018: Comment; ESERVE/KM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE FILING COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where REAGOR DYKES MOTORS LP DOING BUSINESS AS REAGOR AUTO MALL DOING BUS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HENKE, LARRY E