This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 06/02/2022 at 11:11:55 (UTC).

MIGUEL CARRILO vs. CHESAPEAKE OPERATING LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 05/15/2020 MIGUEL CARRILO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CHESAPEAKE OPERATING LLC. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are EVANS, DAVID, LEE, MIKE and PURDY, MONICA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6892

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

EVANS, DAVID

LEE, MIKE

PURDY, MONICA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CARRILO, MIGUEL

Antonio, TX 78230

Defendants

EAGLE PCO LLC

A&L HOT OIL SERVICE INC.

SDS PETROLEUM CONSULTANTS LLC

CHESAPEAKE ENERGY CORPORATION

CHESAPEAKE OPERATING LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DESOUZA, JASON F.

Defendant Attorneys

ZITO, NICHOLAS E

FIELDS, CHARLOTTE A

NORRIS, JOSHUA A

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION

CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION; Comment: TOUCHSTONE IMAGING MEDICAL CENTER

TOUCHSTONE IMAGING MEDICAL CENTER

CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION; Comment: TOUCHSTONE IMAGING MEDICAL CENTER

CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION - TOUCHSTONE IMAGING MEDICAL CENTER (RADIOLOGY)

CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION; Comment: TOUCHSTONE IMAGING MEDICAL CENTER (RADIOLOGY)

CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION - TEXAS VISTA MEDICAL CENTER

CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION; Comment: TEXAS MEDICAL CENTER

CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION BY WRITTEN QUESTIONS - TEXAS IPS - BILLING

CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION; Comment: CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION BY WRITTEN QUESTIONS - TEXAS IPS - BILLING

CERTIFICAT OF DEPOSITION - SAN DIEGO PHARMACY

CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION; Comment: SAN DIEGO PHARMACY

CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION

CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION; Comment: MIGUEL CARRILLO ALICE COST CONTAINMENT MEDICAL

CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION

CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION; Comment: MIGUEL CARRILLO ALICE COST CONTAINMENT BILLING

CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION

CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION; Comment: ADVANCED ORTHOPEDIC DISTRIBUTORS, LLC

AMENDED NOTICE OF INTENT TAKE DEPOSITION BY WRITTEN QUESTIONS

DISCOVERY; Comment: AMENDED NOTICE OF INTENT TAKE DEPOSITION BY WRITTEN QUESTIONS

AMENDED NOTICE OF INTENT TAKE DEPOSITION BY WRITTEN QUESTIONS

DISCOVERY; Comment: AMENDED NOTICE OF INTENT TAKE DEPOSITION BY WRITTEN QUESTIONS

AMENDED NOTICE OF INTENT TAKE DEPOSITION BY WRITTEN QUESTIONS

DISCOVERY; Comment: AMENDED NOTICE OF INTENT TAKE DEPOSITION BY WRITTEN QUESTIONS

AMENDED NOTICE OF INTENT TAKE DEPOSITION BY WRITTEN QUESTIONS

DISCOVERY; Comment: AMENDED NOTICE OF INTENT TAKE DEPOSITION BY WRITTEN QUESTIONS

AMENDED NOTICE OF INTENT TAKE DEPOSITION BY WRITTEN QUESTIONS

DISCOVERY; Comment: AMENDED NOTICE OF INTENT TAKE DEPOSITION BY WRITTEN QUESTIONS

AMENDED NOTICE OF INTENT TAKE DEPOSITION BY WRITTEN QUESTIONS

DISCOVERY; Comment: AMENDED NOTICE OF INTENT TAKE DEPOSITION BY WRITTEN QUESTIONS

AMENDED NOTICE OF INTENT TAKE DEPOSITION BY WRITTEN QUESTIONS

DISCOVERY; Comment: AMENDED NOTICE OF INTENT TAKE DEPOSITION BY WRITTEN QUESTIONS

AMENDED NOTICE OF INTENT TAKE DEPOSITION BY WRITTEN QUESTIONS

DISCOVERY; Comment: AMENDED NOTICE OF INTENT TAKE DEPOSITION BY WRITTEN QUESTIONS

AMENDED NOTICE OF INTENT TAKE DEPOSITION BY WRITTEN QUESTIONS

DISCOVERY; Comment: AMENDED NOTICE OF INTENT TAKE DEPOSITION BY WRITTEN QUESTIONS

189 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISCOVERY; Comment: AMENDED NOTICE OF INTENT TAKE DEPOSITION BY WRITTEN QUESTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISCOVERY; Comment: AMENDED NOTICE OF INTENT TAKE DEPOSITION BY WRITTEN QUESTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISCOVERY; Comment: AMENDED NOTICE OF INTENT TAKE DEPOSITION BY WRITTEN QUESTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISCOVERY; Comment: AMENDED NOTICE OF INTENT TAKE DEPOSITION BY WRITTEN QUESTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISCOVERY; Comment: AMENDED NOTICE OF INTENT TAKE DEPOSITION BY WRITTEN QUESTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISCOVERY; Comment: AMENDED NOTICE OF INTENT TAKE DEPOSITION BY WRITTEN QUESTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISCOVERY; Comment: AMENDED NOTICE OF INTENT TAKE DEPOSITION BY WRITTEN QUESTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISCOVERY; Comment: AMENDED NOTICE OF INTENT TAKE DEPOSITION BY WRITTEN QUESTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISCOVERY; Comment: AMENDED NOTICE OF INTENT TAKE DEPOSITION BY WRITTEN QUESTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISCOVERY; Comment: AMENDED NOTICE OF INTENT TAKE DEPOSITION BY WRITTEN QUESTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
104 More Docket Entries
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJURY DEMAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket- GENERAL DENIAL; ORIGINAL ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketNOTE - CLERKS; Comment: NEED TO PAY FOR CITATIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for CARRILO, MIGUEL : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 28857-2020-DCLK; CARRILO, MIGUEL $332.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for CARRILO, MIGUEL : Transaction Assessment; ; $332.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: CARRILO, MIGUEL ; Total Financial Assessment $332.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $332.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketJURY DEMAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE FILING COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where A&L HOT OIL SERVICE, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where SDS PETROLEUM CONSULTANTS, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Chesapeake Energy Corporation is a litigant