This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 08/03/2022 at 09:27:24 (UTC).

MARVIN CRAWFORD vs. RUFFIN HOTEL CORPORATION OF TEXAS, INC, et al

Case Summary

On 10/15/2020 MARVIN CRAWFORD filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RUFFIN HOTEL CORPORATION OF TEXAS, INC. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are LEE, MIKE and PURDY, MONICA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5562

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

LEE, MIKE

PURDY, MONICA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CRAWFORD, MARVIN

Defendants

MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC

1999 Bryan St. Ste. 900

Dallas, TX 75201-3136

RUFFIN HOTEL CORPORATION OF TEXAS, INC

1999 Bryan St. Ste. 900

Dallas, TX 75201-3136

FAIRFIELD INN & SUITED BY MARRIOT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WARE, NICHOLAS L

Defendant Attorney

MILLER, MICHAEL A

 

Court Documents

PROPOSED ORDER TO RETAIN

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER TO RETAIN

SECOND MOTION TO RETAIN

MOTION - RETAIN; Comment: SECOND

95th Dispo Notice Settled II

95th Dispo Notice Settled II

Final Disposition Hearing

Final Disposition Hearing; Judicial Officer: PURDY, MONICA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: 3/9 - emailed counsel - must appear or case will be dismissed.

PROPOSED ORDER GRANT PLTF/MOTION RETAIN

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER GRANT PLTF/MOTION RETAIN

PLTF/MOTION RETAIN

MOTION - RETAIN; Comment: PLTF

LETTER RE: SETTLEMENT

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: SETTTLEMENT

PROPOSED ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE

PROPOSED AGREED SCHEDULING ORDER

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED AGREED SCHEDULING ORDER

49 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer: PURDY, MONICA; Judgment Type: NON-SUIT/DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF / PETITIONER; Judgment: Total Judgment:; of $0.00: Awarded To:; CRAWFORD, MARVIN: Awarded Against:; RUFFIN HOTEL CORPORATION OF TEXAS, INC, et al

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTE - CLERKS; Comment: MAILED ORDER TO ALL PARTIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketREACTIVATE CASE (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER FOR AGREED DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - DISMISS; Comment: AGREED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinal Disposition Hearing; Judicial Officer: PURDY, MONICA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: 3/30 - emailed counsel - must appear or case will be dismissed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER TO RETAIN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - RETAIN; Comment: SECOND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketNOTE - ADMINISTRATOR; Comment: Final Hearing re-set. E-mailed counsel.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER GRANT PLTF/MOTION RETAIN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketCITATION; Served: 11/11/2020; Anticipated Server: ESERVE; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Returned; 11/12/2020: Comment; RUFFIN HOTEL CORPORATION OF TEXAS, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketCITATION; Served: 11/11/2020; Anticipated Server: ESERVE; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Returned; 11/12/2020: Comment; MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for CRAWFORD, MARVIN : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 64978-2020-DCLK; CRAWFORD, MARVIN $308.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for CRAWFORD, MARVIN : Transaction Assessment; ; $308.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: CRAWFORD, MARVIN ; Total Financial Assessment $308.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $308.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ruffin Hotel Corporation, Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases where Fairfield Inn & Suites by Marriott is a litigant

Latest cases where Marriott International Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WARE, NICHOLAS LEE