This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 05/04/2022 at 10:49:37 (UTC).

MARK TICER vs. SHANE RANGANI, et al

Case Summary

On 06/29/2015 MARK TICER filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SHANE RANGANI. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is GINSBERG, CARL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7323

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

GINSBERG, CARL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TICER d/b/a LAW OFFICE OF MARK A. TICER, MARK A

TICER, MARK A DOING BUSINESS AS LAW OFFICE OF MARK A. TICER

TICER, MARK A

Dallas, TX 75204

LAW OFFICE OF MARK A. TICER

Defendants

AT&T, INC. THROUGH ITS REGISTERED AGENT: CT CORPORATION SYSTEM

RANGANI, SHANE

Dallas, TX 75202

TEDDER, CHUCK

Dallas, TX 75202

AT&T, INC.

350 N. St. Paul St.Suite 2900

Dallas, TX 75201-4234

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MARK A TICER

TICER, MARK A

Defendant Attorneys

CHASTAIN TIMOTHY P, .

MORRIS, JENNIFER

 

Court Documents

DC15-7323.pdf

CITATION ISSUED

SCHEDULING ORDER

SCHEDULING ORDER

Plaintiff's First Amended Original Petition.pdf

AMENDED PETITION; Comment: 1ST

TICER - AGREED M2 DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE.pdf

MOTION - DISMISS; Comment: AGREED

NON-SUIT/DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF / PETITIONER

Disposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer; GINSBERG, CARL; Judgment Type; NON-SUIT/DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF / PETITIONER

ORDER - MEDIATION

ORDER - MEDIATION; Comment: RAY GREEN

ORDER - LIMINE

ORDER - LIMINE

NOTICE

DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: GINSBERG, CARL; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: BY COURT ADMINISTRATOR

TICER___Agreed_Order_of_Dismissal.pdf

MOTION - DISMISS; Comment: AGREED

TICER - AGREED M2 DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE.pdf

MOTION - DISMISS; Comment: AGREED

TICER___Agreed_Order_of_Dismissal.pdf

MOTION - DISMISS; Comment: AGREED

TICER V RANGANI Chuck_Tedder_s_Original_Answer.pdf

ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

TICER V RANGANI Rangani_s_Original_Answer.pdf

ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

Plaintiff's First Amended Original Petition.pdf

AMENDED PETITION; Comment: 1ST

Green Court Ack 193rd 101915.pdf

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: Mediator Acknowledgement

NOTICE

DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: GINSBERG, CARL; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: BY COURT ADMINISTRATOR

ORDER - MEDIATION

ORDER - MEDIATION; Comment: RAY GREEN

ORDER - LIMINE

ORDER - LIMINE

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2016
  • DocketNon Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: GINSBERG, CARL; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer: GINSBERG, CARL; Judgment Type: NON-SUIT/DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF / PETITIONER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: DISMISS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - DISMISS; Comment: AGREED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED PETITION; Comment: 1ST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: Mediator Acknowledgement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: GINSBERG, CARL; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: BY COURT ADMINISTRATOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - MEDIATION; Comment: RAY GREEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: AT&T CITATION RETURN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2015
  • DocketCITATION; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ESERVE: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ESERVE: Anticipated Method; Served: 09/03/2015; Anticipated Server: ESERVE; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Returned; 09/03/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCITATION ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • FinancialFinancial info for TICER, MARK A : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 37568-2015-DCLK; TICER d/b/a LAW OFFICE OF MARK A. TICER, MARK A $301.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • FinancialFinancial info for TICER, MARK A : Transaction Assessment; ; $301.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • FinancialFinancial: TICER, MARK A ; Total Financial Assessment $301.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $301.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE FILING COVER SHEET; Comment: CIVIL CASE INFORMATION SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: Plaintiff's OriginPLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION WITH ATTACHED DISCOVERY REQUESTS AND NOTICE OF INTENTION TO TAKE DEPOSITIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less