This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 06/02/2022 at 11:38:41 (UTC).

LINDA MILANCOVICH, et al vs. CHESAPEAKE ENERGY CORPORATION, et al

Case Summary

On 05/18/2020 LINDA MILANCOVICH filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CHESAPEAKE ENERGY CORPORATION. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is PARKER, TONYA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6977

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

PARKER, TONYA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MILANCOVICH, LINDA

COBB, JUSTIN

COBB, KRISTINE

Defendants

A & L HOT OIL SERVICE INC.

C/O Attorney Nicholas E. Zito; Ramey Chandler Quinn & Zrro, P.C., 750 Bering Drive, Suite 600

Houston, TX 77057

FORBES ENERGY SERVICES, LLC

C/O Attorney Charlie J. Cilfone, P.E., Plunkett, Griesenbeck & Mimari, Inc.

Antonio, TX 78209

FORBES ENERGY SERVICES, LTD.

C/O Attorney Charlie J. Cilfone, P.E., Plunkett, Griesenbeck & Mimari, Inc.

Antonio, TX 78209

C.C. FORBES, LLC

C/O Attorney Charlie J. Cilfone, P.E., Plunkett, Griesenbeck & Mimari, Inc.

Antonio, TX 78209

CHESAPEAKE OPERATION, L.L.C.

C/O Attorney Joshua A. Norris; Jones Walker Llp, 811 Main Street, Suite 2900

Houston, TX 77002

SDS PETROLEUM CONSULTANTS, LLC

C/O Attorney Brenda P. Doherty, Gieger, Laborde & Laperouse, L.L.C.

Houston, TX 77056

CHESAPEAKE ENERGY CORPORATION

C/O Attorney Joshua A. Norris; Jones Walker Llp, 811 Main Street, Suite 2900

Houston, TX 77002

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZEHL, RYAN H.

Defendant Attorneys

ZITO, NICHOLAS E

CILFONE, CHARLES J

NORRIS, JOSHUA A

FIELDS, CHARLOTTE A

 

Court Documents

LTR TO COURT, RE: MDL CASE ASSIGNMENT AND STATUS OF CASE

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: RE: MDL CASE ASSIGNMENT AND STATUS OF CASE

MSL ORDER ISSUED 7/20/20

MISCELLANOUS EVENT; Comment: MDL ORDER ISSUED 7/20/20

COPY OF CLOSING ORDER MAILED TO CHARLOTTE A. FIELDS

NOTE - CLERKS; Comment: COPY OF CLOSING ORDER MAILED TO ALL

COPY OF CLOSING ORDER MAILED TO NICHOLAS E. ZITO

NOTE - CLERKS; Comment: COPY OF CLOSING ORDER MAILED TO ALL

COPY OF CLOSING ORDER MAILED TO CHARLES J. CILFONE

NOTE - CLERKS; Comment: COPY OF CLOSING ORDER MAILED TO ALL

COPY OF CLOSING ORDER MAILED TO JOSHUA A. NORRIS

NOTE - CLERKS; Comment: COPY OF CLOSING ORDER MAILED TO ALL

COPY OF CLOSING ORDER MAILED TO RYAN H. ZEHL

NOTE - CLERKS; Comment: COPY OF CLOSING ORDER MAILED TO ALL

COPY OF CLOSING ORDER MAILED TO CHARLOTTE A. FIELDS

NOTE - CLERKS; Comment: COPY OF CLOSING ORDER MAILED TO ALL

COPY OF CLOSING ORDER MAILED TO NICHOLAS E. ZITO

NOTE - CLERKS; Comment: COPY OF CLOSING ORDER MAILED TO ALL

COPY OF CLOSING ORDER MAILED TO CHARLES J. CILFONE

NOTE - CLERKS; Comment: COPY OF CLOSING ORDER MAILED TO ALL

COPY OF CLOSING ORDER MAILED TO JOSHUA A. NORRIS

NOTE - CLERKS; Comment: COPY OF CLOSING ORDER MAILED TO ALL

COPY OF CLOSING ORDER MAILED TO RYAN H. ZEHL

NOTE - CLERKS; Comment: COPY OF CLOSING ORDER MAILED TO ALL

JURY DEMAND

JURY DEMAND

ORIGINAL ANSWER

- GENERAL DENIAL; ORIGINAL ANSWER

DEFENDANTS FORBES ENERGY SERVIES, LTD., C.C. FORBES, LLC AND FORBES ENERGY SERVICES, LLC'S ANSWER

ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

DEFENDANT ORIGINAL ANSWER-CHESAPEAKE

ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

JURY DEMAND FORM

JURY DEMAND

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketVACATION LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: RE: MDL CASE ASSIGNMENT AND STATUS OF CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMISCELLANOUS EVENT; Comment: MDL ORDER ISSUED 7/20/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTE - CLERKS; Comment: COPY OF CLOSING ORDER MAILED TO ALL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer: PARKER, TONYA; Judgment Type: ALL OTHER DISPOSITIONS; Judgment: Total Judgment:; of $0.00: Awarded To:; CHESAPEAKE ENERGY CORPORATION: Awarded Against:; MILANCOVICH, LINDA, et al

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY; Comment: NOTICE OF SUGGESTION OF PENDENCY OF BANKRUPTCY AND AUTOMATIC STAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for A & L HOT OIL SERVICE INC. : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 31692-2020-DCLK; A & L HOT OIL SERVICE INC. $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for A & L HOT OIL SERVICE INC. : Transaction Assessment; ; $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: A & L HOT OIL SERVICE INC. ; Total Financial Assessment $40.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJURY DEMAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket- GENERAL DENIAL; ORIGINAL ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for MILANCOVICH, LINDA : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 29147-2020-DCLK; MILANCOVICH, LINDA $332.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for MILANCOVICH, LINDA : Transaction Assessment; ; $332.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: MILANCOVICH, LINDA ; Total Financial Assessment $332.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $332.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJURY DEMAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CC FORBES, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SDS PETROLEUM CONSULTANTS, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Chesapeake Energy Corporation is a litigant