This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 06/03/2022 at 11:22:29 (UTC).

KATIA CARROLL vs. PREMIER TRAILER LEASING, INC., et al

Case Summary

On 08/28/2020 KATIA CARROLL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PREMIER TRAILER LEASING, INC . This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are WYSOCKI, ASHLEY and GOLDSTEIN, BONNIE LEE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2119

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

GOLDSTEIN, BONNIE LEE

WYSOCKI, ASHLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CARROLL, KATIA

Dallas, TX 75231

Defendants

PREMIER TRAILER LEASING, INC.

701 Brazos St Ste 720

Austin, TX 78701

LAND AIR EXPRESS, INC.

10358 Cr 3101

Wilnona, TX 75792

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LINK, FELIPE B.

Defendant Attorney

COX, CLINTON V., IV

 

Court Documents

MAILED DISMISSAL TO FELIPE L.

MAILED DISMISSAL TO FELIPE L.

MAILED DISMISSAL TO CLINTON C.

MAILED DISMISSAL TO CLINTON C.

PROPOSED ORDER OF DISMISSAL

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER OF DISMISSAL

MTN TO DISMISS

MOTION - DISMISS

NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVITS

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: NOTICE OF FILING

VACATION LETTER - CLINT COX

VACATION LETTER; Comment: VACATION LETTER - CLINT COX

NOTICE OF TRIAL

NOTICE OF TRIAL

NOTICE OF ADDRESS CHANGE

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

SCHEDULING ORDER

SCHEDULING ORDER; Comment: AGREED

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketTRIAL SETTING (NON JURY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketNon Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: WYSOCKI, ASHLEY; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: BY COURT ADMINISTRATOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketNOTE - CLERKS; Comment: COPY TO PLT AND DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer: GOLDSTEIN, BONNIE LEE; Judgment Type: NON-SUIT/DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF / PETITIONER; Judgment: Total Judgment:; of $0.00: Awarded To:; CARROLL, KATIA, et al: Awarded Against:; CARROLL, KATIA, et al

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Comment: NOTICE OF FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVACATION LETTER; Comment: VACATION LETTER - CLINT COX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket- GENERAL DENIAL; ORIGINAL ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketCITATION; Served: 09/24/2020; Anticipated Server: ESERVE; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; OUT OF COUNTY: Returned; 10/02/2020: Comment; LAND AIR EXPRESS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketCITATION; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ESERVE: Anticipated Method; Comment: PREMIER TRAILER LEASING INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for CARROLL, KATIA : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 52864-2020-DCLK; CARROLL, KATIA $308.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for CARROLL, KATIA : Transaction Assessment; ; $308.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: CARROLL, KATIA ; Total Financial Assessment $308.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $308.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LAND AIR EXPRESS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Premier Trailer Leasing, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LINK, FELIPE B.