This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 06/30/2022 at 18:12:09 (UTC).

JOHN WOZNIAK vs. NYLO HOLDINGS LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 01/21/2020 JOHN WOZNIAK filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against NYLO HOLDINGS LLC,. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are WYSOCKI, ASHLEY and GOLDSTEIN, BONNIE LEE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1026

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

WYSOCKI, ASHLEY

GOLDSTEIN, BONNIE LEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WOZNIAK, JOHN

Dallas, TX 75201

Defendants

PRISM HOSPITALITY LP

1999 Bryan St Ste 900

Dallas, TX 75201

BT HOTEL PLANO LLC

8201 Preston Road

Plano, TX 75024

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SARGENT, DAVID LYNN

Defendant Attorney

WALRAVEN, ERIC G

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION - JOHN P. MARINO, MD

CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION; Comment: JOHN P. MARINO, MD

CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION - JOHN P. MARINO, MD

CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION; Comment: JOHN P. MARINO, MD

NOTICE OF INTENTION TO TAKE DEPOSITION BY WRITTEN QUESTIONS

DISCOVERY; Comment: NOTICE OF INTENTION TO TAKE DEPOSITION BY WRITTEN QUESTIONS

NOTICE OF INTENTION TO TAKE DEPOSITION BY WRITTEN QUESTIONS

DISCOVERY; Comment: NOTICE OF INTENTION TO TAKE DEPOSITION BY WRITTEN QUESTIONS

AGREED MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE

MOTION - CONTINUANCE; Comment: AGREED

TEXAS HEALTH PRESBYTERIAN HOSPITAL PLANO

CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION; Comment: TEXAS HEALTH PRESBYTERIAN HOSPITAL PLANO

CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION - ADVANCED INJURY CARE

CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION; Comment: ADVANCED INJURY CARE

NOTICE OF INTENTION TO TAKE DEPOSITION BY WRITTEN QUESTIONS

DISCOVERY; Comment: NOTICE OF INTENTION TO TAKE DEPOSITION BY WRITTEN QUESTIONS

CERTIFICAE DEPOSITION/ESQUIRE SPORTS MEDICINE

CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION; Comment: ESQUIRE SPORTS MEDICINE

CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION- JOHN WOZNIAK

CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION; Comment: JOHN WOZNIAK

LETTER CASE SETTLED AFTER MEDIATION FROM MEDIATOR

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: LETTER CASE SETTLED AFTER MEDIATION FROM MEDIATOR

NOTICE OF TRIAL

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: JURY

SCHEDULING ORDER

SCHEDULING ORDER; Comment: LEVEL 3

TEXAS HEALTH PRESBYTERIAN HOSPITAL PLANO

CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION; Comment: TEXAS HEALTH PRESBYTERIAN HOSPITAL PLANO

CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION - CENTER FOR DIAGNOSTIC IMAGING

CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION; Comment: CENTER FOR DIAGNOSTIC IMAGING

CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION - CENTER FOR DIAGNOSTIC IMAGING

CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION; Comment: CENTER FOR DIAGNOSTIC IMAGING

NOTICE OF HEARING - MOTION CONTINUANCE

NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT; Comment: MOTION CONTINUANCE

CERTIFICATION OF DEPOSITION BY WRITTEN QUESTIONS - ADVANCED INJURY CARE

CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION; Comment: CERTIFICATION OF DEPOSITION BY WRITTEN QUESTIONS - ADVANCED INJURY CARE

106 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketTRIAL SETTING (JURY); Comment: P SLIPPED ON WET FLOOR IN HOTEL BATHROOM, LEVEL 3 CASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketJury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: WYSOCKI, ASHLEY; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE SETTLED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION; Comment: JOHN WOZNIAK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketINACTIVATE CASE (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: LETTER CASE SETTLED AFTER MEDIATION FROM MEDIATOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketJury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: WYSOCKI, ASHLEY; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE TRIAL RESET; Comment: EMAILED PARTIES 5/26, M/CONT REQUIRES HRG, SEE NOTES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketNon Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: WYSOCKI, ASHLEY; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: BY COURT ADMINISTRATOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: JURY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSCHEDULING ORDER; Comment: LEVEL 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION; Comment: TEXAS HEALTH PRESBYTERIAN HOSPITAL PLANO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
57 More Docket Entries
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketCITATION; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ESERVE: Anticipated Method; Comment: PRISM HOSPITALITY, LP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketCITATION; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ESERVE: Anticipated Method; Comment: NYLO HOLDINGS, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for WOZNIAK, JOHN : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 4566-2020-DCLK; WOZNIAK, JOHN $348.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for WOZNIAK, JOHN : Transaction Assessment; ; $348.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: WOZNIAK, JOHN ; Total Financial Assessment $396.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $396.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE FILING COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Prism Hospitality LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SARGENT, DAVID LYNN