This case was last updated from Dallas County Texas Courts on 05/05/2022 at 02:02:11 (UTC).

JAN KNOLL vs. ELITE CLEAN & RESTORATION, INC., LONGHORN INVESTMENT PROPERTIES LLC, RICKY L COATS

Case Summary

On 07/24/2020 JAN KNOLL filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ELITE CLEAN RESTORATION, INC , LONGHORN INVESTMENT PROPERTIES LLC, RICKY L COATS. This case was filed in Dallas County Texas Courts, Dallas County Texas Courts At Law located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is MONTGOMERY, SALLY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********30-C

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

MONTGOMERY, SALLY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KNOLL, JAN

Hill, TX 75104

Defendants

ELITE CLEAN & RESTORATION, INC.

5201 Gordon Smith

Rowlett, TX 75088

COATS, RICKY L

Rowlett, TX 75088

LONGHORN INVESTMENT PROPERTIES LLC

5201 Gordon Smith Drive

Rowlett, TX 75088

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

PAGE, KRISTINA

PAGE, KRISTINA L

Defendant Attorney

ROTH, MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

3 CCL#3 JURY TRIAL NOTICE

NON JURY TRIAL; Judicial Officer: MONTGOMERY, SALLY; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

3 CCL#3 JURY TRIAL NOTICE

NON JURY TRIAL; Judicial Officer: MONTGOMERY, SALLY; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

3 CCL#3 JURY TRIAL NOTICE

NON JURY TRIAL; Judicial Officer: MONTGOMERY, SALLY; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

3 CCL#3 JURY TRIAL NOTICE

NON JURY TRIAL; Judicial Officer: MONTGOMERY, SALLY; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

PLAINTIFF JAN KNOLL S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY TO SHOW AUTHORITY

MOTION - MISCELLANEOUS; Comment: MOTION - ATTORNEY SHOW AUTHORITY

3 CCL#3 JURY TRIAL NOTICE

NON JURY TRIAL; Judicial Officer: MONTGOMERY, SALLY; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

3 CCL#3 JURY TRIAL NOTICE

NON JURY TRIAL; Judicial Officer: MONTGOMERY, SALLY; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

1 CCL#3 TRIAL LETTER

NON JURY TRIAL; Judicial Officer: MONTGOMERY, SALLY; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

1 CCL#3 TRIAL LETTER

NON JURY TRIAL; Judicial Officer: MONTGOMERY, SALLY; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

1 CCL#3 TRIAL LETTER

NON JURY TRIAL; Judicial Officer: MONTGOMERY, SALLY; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

1 CCL#3 TRIAL LETTER

NON JURY TRIAL; Judicial Officer: MONTGOMERY, SALLY; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

CITATION

ISSUE CITATION; Comment: ESERVE 45163102, CORRECTED CITATION ESERVED 45207925

CITATION

ISSUE CITATION; Comment: ESERVE 45163102, CORRECTED CITATION ESERVED 45207925

PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED PETITION AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE

AMENDED PETITION; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED PETITION AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE

CITATION 2012

ISSUE CITATION; Comment: E-SERVE ENVELOPE# 44891870

CITATION 2012

ISSUE CITATION; Comment: E-SERVE ENVELOPE# 44891870

CITATION 2012

ISSUE CITATION; Comment: E-SERVE ENVELOPE# 44891870

PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION & REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE

166 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON JURY TRIAL; Judicial Officer: MONTGOMERY, SALLY; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketNON JURY TRIAL; Judicial Officer: MONTGOMERY, SALLY; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Comment: CONTINUED FROM 5/2/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - MISCELLANEOUS; Comment: MOTION - ATTORNEY SHOW AUTHORITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON JURY TRIAL; Judicial Officer: MONTGOMERY, SALLY; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS; Comment: SUBPOENA FOR TRIAL GONZALO POSADA III

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS; Comment: SUBPOENA FOR TRIAL RICKY L. COATS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS; Comment: SUBPOENA FOR TRIAL JACK A. DECHRISTOPHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS; Comment: SUBPOENA FOR TRIAL JESSICA GARCIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPORTER CERTIFICATE; Comment: JAN KNOLL; OCTOBER 28, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - EXCLUDE; Comment: MOTION TO EXCLUDE PLAINTIFF'S EXPERT WITNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
67 More Docket Entries
  • 08/05/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for KNOLL, JAN : Transaction Assessment; ; $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION; Comment: ESERVE 45163102, CORRECTED CITATION ESERVED 45207925

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED PETITION; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED PETITION AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketCITATION (SERVICE); Served: 09/15/2020; Anticipated Server: ATTORNEY; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Returned; 09/17/2020: Unserved; Anticipated Server: ATTORNEY; Anticipated Method: Unserved; Anticipated Server: ATTORNEY; Anticipated Method

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for KNOLL, JAN : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (CC); Receipt # CV-2020-08135; KNOLL, JAN $289.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for KNOLL, JAN : Transaction Assessment; ; $289.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: KNOLL, JAN ; Total Financial Assessment $293.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $293.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION; Comment: E-SERVE ENVELOPE# 44891870

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION & REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PAGE, KRISTINA L