This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 01/02/2023 at 05:56:32 (UTC).

IRONPLANET INC vs. XTREME IRON HOLDINGS LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 02/03/2012 IRONPLANET INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against XTREME IRON HOLDINGS LLC,. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is JORDAN, JIM. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1280

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

JORDAN, JIM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

IRONPLANET INC

Defendants

XTREME IRON LLC

XTREME IRON HOLDINGS LLC

XTREME IRON CONSTRUCTION LLC

FIVEPOINT DEVELOPMENT GROUP LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MORRIS, JENNIFER

Defendant Attorneys

MITCHELL, GREGORY W

ARCHIBALD, RICHARD

 

Court Documents

06-21-2012 - Notice of Bankruptcy CV - DC1201280 - 9072357.pdf

NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY; Comment: SUGGESTION

05-03-2012 - Motion - NonSuit CV - DC1201280 - 8374094.pdf

MOTION - NONSUIT

07-03-2012 - Motion - Withdraw Attorney CV - DC1201280 - 9239290.pdf

MOTION - WITHDRAW ATTORNEY

07-18-2012 - Order - Withdraw Attorney - DC Civ M - DC1201280 - 98 - 9461925.pdf

ORDER - WITHDRAW ATTORNEY; Comment: & FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

04-25-2012 - Order - Deny Continuance - DC Civ M - DC1201280 - 204 - 8266439.pdf

ORDER - DENY CONTINUANCE

04-19-2012 - Response CV - DC1201280 - 8164449.pdf

RESPONSE; Comment: REPLY TO DEF RES IN OPPOSITION TO PL M/PARTIAL SJ

03-19-2012 - Special Exceptions - DC Civ P - DC1201280 - 7715941.pdf

SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS; Comment: XTREME HOLDINGS: & ORIGINAL ANSWER

4-23-2012 - Motion - Continuance CV - DC1201280 - 8221109.pdf

MOTION - CONTINUANCE

04-24-2012 - Correspondence - Letter to File CV - DC1201280 - 8220565.pdf

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE

4-17-2012 - Original Answer - General Denial CV - DC1201280 - 8137692.pdf

4-17-2012 - Original Answer - General Denial CV - DC1201280 - 8137692.pdf

4-17-2012 - Original Answer - General Denial CV - DC1201280 - 8137685.pdf

4-17-2012 - Original Answer - General Denial CV - DC1201280 - 8137685.pdf

03-19-2012 - Original Answer - General Denial CV - DC1201280 - 7714437.pdf

03-19-2012 - Original Answer - General Denial CV - DC1201280 - 7714437.pdf

03-19-2012 - Original Answer - General Denial CV - DC1201280 - 7715670.pdf

03-19-2012 - Original Answer - General Denial CV - DC1201280 - 7715670.pdf

03-19-2012 - Original Answer - General Denial CV - DC1201280 - 7715928.pdf

03-19-2012 - Original Answer - General Denial CV - DC1201280 - 7715928.pdf

06-12-2012 - Notice of Trial CV - DC1201280 - 8941797.pdf

06-12-2012 - Notice of Trial CV - DC1201280 - 8941797.pdf

02-06-2012 - Issue Citation - CV - DC1201280 - 7344480.pdf

02-06-2012 - Issue Citation - CV - DC1201280 - 7344480.pdf

02-06-2012 - Issue Citation - CV - DC1201280 - 7344487.pdf

02-06-2012 - Issue Citation - CV - DC1201280 - 7344487.pdf

02-06-2012 - Issue Citation - CV - DC1201280 - 7344559.pdf

02-06-2012 - Issue Citation - CV - DC1201280 - 7344559.pdf

47 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2013
  • DocketNon Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: JORDAN, JIM; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED; Comment: Order Administratively Closing Case signed 6/25/12

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2012
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer: JORDAN, JIM; Judgment Type: ALL OTHER DISPOSITIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2012
  • DocketNOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - WITHDRAW ATTORNEY; Comment: & FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2012
  • DocketNOTE - CLERKS; Comment: O/WITHDRAW & SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL SUBMITTED TO JUDGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - WITHDRAW ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • DocketNOTE - CLERKS; Comment: O/ADMIN CLOSE SENT TO ALL ATTY OF RECORD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2012
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer: JORDAN, JIM; Judgment Type: ALL OTHER DISPOSITIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY; Comment: SUGGESTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2012
  • DocketMOTION HEARING; Judicial Officer: JORDAN, JIM; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: 15 MIN - DAVID 214-855-3127 (CC REQ'D) COURTESY COPY RCVD 6/5/12

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 02/06/2012
  • DocketCITATION; Served: 02/24/2012; Anticipated Server: CERTIFIED MAIL; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; CERTIFIED MAIL: Returned; 02/27/2012: Comment; TRCK#7196 9007 2680 0414 5375

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2012
  • DocketCITATION; Served: 02/24/2012; Anticipated Server: CERTIFIED MAIL; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; CERTIFIED MAIL: Returned; 02/27/2012: Comment; TRCK# 7196 9007 2680 0414 5436

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2012
  • DocketCITATION; Served: 02/24/2012; Anticipated Server: CERTIFIED MAIL; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; CERTIFIED MAIL: Returned; 02/27/2012: Comment; EL/ATTY/ TRCK#7160 9007 2680 0414 5511/CM SENT 2/20/11

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2012
  • FinancialFinancial info for IRONPLANET INC : PAYMENT (CASE FEES); Receipt # 6718-2012-DCLK; CARRINGTON COLEMAN $284.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2012
  • FinancialFinancial info for IRONPLANET INC : Transaction Assessment; ; $32.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2012
  • FinancialFinancial info for IRONPLANET INC : Transaction Assessment; ; $252.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2012
  • FinancialFinancial: IRONPLANET INC ; Total Financial Assessment $544.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $544.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE FILING COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2012
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less