This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 12/31/2022 at 16:17:28 (UTC).

IN RE HOULIHAN LOKEY HOWARD & ZUKIN FINANCIAL ADVISORS INC

Case Summary

On 10/15/2012 IN RE HOULIHAN LOKEY HOWARD ZUKIN FINANCIAL ADVISORS INC was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is GINSBERG, CARL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2250

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

GINSBERG, CARL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DIRIENZO, FREDERICK

Defendant

Houlihan Lokey Howard & Zukin Financial Advisors, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRINKMAN, TAYLOR F.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING

NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING

10-15-2012 - Original Petition (OCA) CV - DC1212250 - 11040088.pdf

ORIGINAL PETITION (OCA)

NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING

NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING

DiRienzo - Order of Dismissal Without Prejudice.pdf

NOTICE OF NONSUIT; Comment: Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice

NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING

NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING

10-19-2012 - Return of Service CV - DC1212250 - 11114364.pdf

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: 1 ATTY SUBP ISSUED EXEC 10/18/12 ( HOULIHAN LOKEY HOWARD & ZUKIN FINANCIAL ADVISORS INC) PPS TENDER FEE $11

NON-SUIT/DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF / PETITIONER

Disposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer; GINSBERG, CARL; Judgment Type; NON-SUIT/DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF / PETITIONER

DiRienzo - Notice of Dismissal.pdf

NOTICE OF NONSUIT; Comment: Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice

NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING

NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING

10-17-2012 - Notice of Hearing-Fiat CV - DC1212250 - 11092516.pdf

10-17-2012 - Notice of Hearing-Fiat CV - DC1212250 - 11092516.pdf

01-25-2013 - Status Conference - DC Civ P - DC1212250 - 13067979.pdf

01-25-2013 - Status Conference - DC Civ P - DC1212250 - 13067979.pdf

03-26-2013 - Status Conference - DC Civ P - DC1212250 - 14311006.pdf

03-26-2013 - Status Conference - DC Civ P - DC1212250 - 14311006.pdf

DiRienzo - Order of Dismissal Without Prejudice.pdf

NOTICE OF NONSUIT; Comment: Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice

DiRienzo - Notice of Dismissal.pdf

NOTICE OF NONSUIT; Comment: Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice

NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING

NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING

NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING

NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING

NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING

NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING

NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING

NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer: GINSBERG, CARL; Judgment Type: NON-SUIT/DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF / PETITIONER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2014
  • DocketNOTE - CLERKS; Comment: ***Dismissal Order Submitted***

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF NONSUIT; Comment: Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2014
  • DocketStatus Conference; Judicial Officer: GINSBERG, CARL; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2014
  • DocketStatus Conference; Judicial Officer: GINSBERG, CARL; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2013
  • DocketStatus Conference; Judicial Officer: GINSBERG, CARL; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2013
  • DocketStatus Conference; Judicial Officer: GINSBERG, CARL; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/26/2013
  • DocketStatus Conference; Judicial Officer: GINSBERG, CARL; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2013
  • DocketStatus Conference; Judicial Officer: GINSBERG, CARL; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2013
  • DocketStatus Conference; Judicial Officer: GINSBERG, CARL; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2013
  • DocketDISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: GINSBERG, CARL; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: BY COURT ADMINISTRATOR; Comment: INITIAL DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: 1 ATTY SUBP ISSUED EXEC 10/18/12 ( HOULIHAN LOKEY HOWARD & ZUKIN FINANCIAL ADVISORS INC) PPS TENDER FEE $11

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2012
  • FinancialFinancial info for DIRIENZO, FREDERICK : PAYMENT (CASE FEES); Receipt # 61233-2012-DCLK; LOCKE LIDDELL DALLAS $252.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2012
  • FinancialFinancial info for DIRIENZO, FREDERICK : Transaction Assessment; ; $252.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2012
  • FinancialFinancial: DIRIENZO, FREDERICK ; Total Financial Assessment $252.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $252.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less