This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 05/20/2022 at 23:06:50 (UTC).

HIGHLAND PARK INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT vs. JOHN R. BUNTEN, JR. et al

Case Summary

On 04/03/2018 HIGHLAND PARK INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against JOHN R BUNTEN, JR. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is SIMS, M. KENT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0541

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

SIMS, M. KENT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HIGHLAND PARK INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

CITY OF UNIVERSITY PARK

Defendants

GRAHAM MORTGAGE CORPORATION

BUNTEN, JR., JOHN R.

COMPASS BANK

BUNTEN, DANA LOU

HUNTER-KELSEY II, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FERNANDEZ, ELENA N

Defendant Attorney

O'DENS, DAVID M

 

Court Documents

NONSIGNED ORDER FOR DISMISSAL

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: ORDER FOR DISMISSAL

MOTION FOR DISMISSAL

MOTION - DISMISS

DEPUTY REPORTER STATEMENT

DEPUTY REPORTER STATEMENT

ORDER - DISMISSAL

ORDER - DISMISSAL; Comment: CITY OF UNIVERSITY PARK & HIGHLAND PARK ISD

PROPOSED ORDER FOR DISMISSAL

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: ORDER OF DISMISSAL

Non Jury Trial

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LINEBARGER

Non Jury Trial

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: PERDUE

Non Jury Trial

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: DAVID M O'DENS

M/A - JOHN R. BUNTEN JR.

ISSUE CITATION

M/A - HUNTER-KELSEY II LLC

ISSUE CITATION

M/A - GRAHAM MORTGAGE CORPORATION

ISSUE CITATION

M/A - DANA LOU BUNTEN

ISSUE CITATION

M/A - COMPASS BANK

ISSUE CITATION

REQUEST FOR SERVICE

REQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: 6 MAIL ATTORNEY

PERDUE

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: PERDUE

4937 Info.pdf

CASE FILING COVER SHEET

4937 Original.pdf

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: - REAL

NON-SUIT/DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF / PETITIONER

Disposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer; SIMS, M. KENT; Judgment Type; NON-SUIT/DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF / PETITIONER; Judgment; Total Judgment:; of $0.00; Awarded To:; HIGHLAND PARK INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT; Awarded Against:; BUNTEN, JR., JOHN R.

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2019
  • DocketDISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: SIMS, M. KENT; Hearing Time: 12:01 PM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer: SIMS, M. KENT; Judgment Type: NON-SUIT/DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF / PETITIONER; Judgment: Total Judgment:; of $0.00: Awarded To:; HIGHLAND PARK INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT: Awarded Against:; BUNTEN, JR., JOHN R.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: ORDER FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - DISMISS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for BUNTEN, JR., JOHN R. : PAYMENT (CASE FEES); Receipt # 10054-2019-DCLK; HUNTER KELSEY II LLC $80.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEPUTY REPORTER STATEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketJUDGE DOCKET ENTRY; Comment: TO DWP DKT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: SIMS, M. KENT; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - DISMISSAL; Comment: CITY OF UNIVERSITY PARK & HIGHLAND PARK ISD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: ORDER OF DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 04/04/2018
  • FinancialFinancial info for HIGHLAND PARK INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT : Transaction Assessment; ; $48.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • DocketCITATION; Served: 04/30/2018; Anticipated Server: ATTORNEY; Anticipated Method: Served; 04/30/2018: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Served: 04/19/2018; Anticipated Server: ATTORNEY; Anticipated Method: Served; 04/16/2018: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Served: 05/21/2018; Anticipated Server: ATTORNEY; Anticipated Method: Served; 04/13/2018: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Comment: 6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: 6 MAIL ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • FinancialFinancial info for HIGHLAND PARK INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT : Transaction Assessment; ; $237.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • FinancialFinancial: HIGHLAND PARK INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT ; Total Financial Assessment $605.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $605.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: PERDUE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE FILING COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: - REAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less