This case was last updated from Dallas County Texas Courts on 05/09/2022 at 02:09:40 (UTC).

GUARDIANSHIP OF ANDREW THOMAS WAIHI

Case Summary

On 11/20/2020 GUARDIANSHIP OF ANDREW THOMAS WAIHI was filed as a Probate - Guardianship lawsuit. This case was filed in Dallas County Texas Courts, Dallas County Probate Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMPSON, BRENDA H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********20-1

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Guardianship

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

THOMPSON, BRENDA H

 

Party Details

Applicants

WAIHI, DUANE ALAN

Garland, TX 75042

WAIHI, VICKI DARLENE

Garland, TX 75042

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

MIMS, LISABETH ANN

 

Court Documents

Dallas County.Request Letters of Guardian.ltr.pdf

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: REQUEST FOR LETTERS

ORDER - APPROVING BOND

ORDER - APPROVING BOND; Comment: - IN SUM OF ONE HUNDRED DOLLARS ($100.00)

ORDER - ATTORNEY FEES

ORDER - ATTORNEY FEES

ORDER - APPOINTING GUARDIAN OF THE PERSON

ORDER - APPOINTING GUARDIAN OF THE PERSON; Comment: WITH BOND FOR $100.00

54A.216 De Novo Waiver (COURT 1).pdf

WAIVER; Comment: WAIVER OF DE NOVO HEARING

Order Appointing Guardian.2 Full.pdf

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: HEARING DOCUMENTS: PROPOSED ORDER AND OATH

Clerk.Dallas County Hearing Docs.pdf

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: HEARING DOCUMENTS: PROPOSED ORDER AND OATH

ORDER TO APPOINT.pdf

ORDER - APPOINTING COURT INVESTIGATOR; Comment: ORDER APPOINTING COURT INVESTIGATOR

RETURN PERSONAL CITATION

RETURN PERSONAL CITATION

44 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - APPROVING BOND; Comment: - IN SUM OF ONE HUNDRED DOLLARS ($100.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND FILED - GDN PERSON; Comment: - IN SUM OF ONE HUNDRED DOLLARS ($100.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: LETTER SUBMITTING PAYMENT FOR CASH BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - ATTORNEY FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - APPOINTING GUARDIAN OF THE PERSON; Comment: WITH BOND FOR $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: REQUEST FOR LETTERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOATH FILED; Comment: DUANE ALAN WAIHI AND VICKI DARLENE WAIHI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR GUARDIANSHIP OF THE PERSON; Judicial Officer: THOMPSON, BRENDA H; Hearing Time: 09:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWAIVER; Comment: WAIVER OF DE NOVO HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWAIVER; Comment: WAIVER OF DE NOVO HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION; Comment: COURT RTN: 12/21/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketISSUE POSTED NOTICES; Comment: COURT RTN: 12/21/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: ORDER AUTHORIZING ACCESS TO PROTECTED INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWAIVER; Comment: WAIVER OF CITATION; CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN - SOPHIE WAIHI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: AD LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for WAIHI, DUANE ALAN : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (CC); Receipt # PR-2020-18057; WAIHI, DUANE ALAN $357.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for WAIHI, DUANE ALAN : Transaction Assessment; ; $357.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: WAIHI, DUANE ALAN ; Total Financial Assessment $357.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $357.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION; Comment: APPLICATION FOR GUARDIANSHIP WITH FULL POWERS OF THE PERSON ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lisabeth A Mims