This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 09/13/2021 at 20:16:06 (UTC).

GUADELUPA LIRA vs. METHODIST HEALTH CENTERS, et al

Case Summary

On 12/21/2020 GUADELUPA LIRA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against METHODIST HEALTH CENTERS. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is HOFFMAN, MARTIN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8755

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

HOFFMAN, MARTIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LIRA, GUADALUPE

LIRA, GUADELUPA

Defendants

METHODIST HEALTH CENTERS

METHODIST CHARLTON MEDICAL CENTER

METHODIST HEALTH SYSTEM

MEDHEALTH A/K/A METHODIST CHARLTON MEDICAL CENTER

1999 Bryan St., Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SAID, MOHAMMAD

SAID, MOHAMMAD Y

Defendant Attorney

MITZNER, MATTHEW M.

 

Court Documents

EXECUTED CITATION - MEDHEALTH

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - MEDHEALTH

MAILED TO MOHAMMAS SAID

MAILED TO MOHAMMAS SAID

MOTION TO NONSUIT

MOTION - NONSUIT

PROPOSED ORDER NONSUIT

MOTION - NONSUIT

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION

FIRST AMENDED PETITION

AMENDED PETITION

MAILED TO MATTHEW MITZNER

MAILED TO MATTHEW MITZNER

ISSUE CITATION - METHODIST HEALTH CENTERS

ISSUE CITATION

FIRST AMENDED PETITION

AMENDED PETITION; Comment: FIRST AMENDED

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer: HOFFMAN, MARTIN; Judgment Type: NON-SUIT/DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF / PETITIONER; Judgment: Total Judgment:; of $0.00: Awarded To:; LIRA, GUADELUPA: Awarded Against:; LIRA, GUADELUPA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketNOTE - CLERKS; Comment: COPY OF NONSUIT SENT TO PLTF AND DEF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketNOTE - ADMINISTRATOR; Comment: FWD SIGNED NONSUIT TO CLERKS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketNOTE - ADMINISTRATOR; Comment: FWD NONSUIT TO JUDGE FOR REV FOR THE LAST DEFT- MEDHEALTH/ METHODIST CHARLTON MEDICAL CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO NONSUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - NONSUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketNOTE - ADMINISTRATOR; Comment: FWD SIGNED NONSUIT TO CLERKS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NONSUIT; Comment: AGAINST METHODIST HEALTH CENTERS AKA METHODIST HEALTH SYSTEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketNOTE - ADMINISTRATOR; Comment: FWD NONSUIT TO JUDGE FOR REV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER OF NONSUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - NONSUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION: METHODIST HEALTH CENTERS MK/A METHODIST HEALTH SYSTEM AK/A METHODIST CHARLTON MEDICAL CENTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketCITATION; Served: 12/29/2020; Anticipated Server: ESERVE; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Returned; 12/31/2020: Comment; METHODIST HEALTH CENTERS MK/A METHODIST HEALTH SYSTEM AK/A METHODIST CHARLTON MEDICAL CENTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for LIRA, GUADELUPA : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 79633-2020-DCLK; LIRA, GUADALUPE $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for LIRA, GUADELUPA : Transaction Assessment; ; $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: LIRA, GUADELUPA ; Total Financial Assessment $308.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $308.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where METHODIST CHARLTON MEDICAL CENTER, is a litigant

Latest cases where METHODIST HEALTH CENTERS (D/B/A HOUSTON METHODIST HOSPITAL (AN ENTITY is a litigant

Latest cases where Methodist Healthcare is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MITZNER, MATTHEW M.