This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 11/27/2022 at 05:10:54 (UTC).

GRAHAM MORTGAGE CORP vs. ISERVE SERVICING INC

Case Summary

On 05/14/2012 GRAHAM MORTGAGE CORP filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ISERVE SERVICING INC. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is TILLERY, DALE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5375

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

TILLERY, DALE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GRAHAM MORTGAGE CORP

Defendant

ISERVE SERVICING INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MORRIS, JENNIFER

DIAMOND, DAVID J

 

Court Documents

05-14-2012 - Original Petition (OCA) CV - DC1205375 - 8561402.pdf

ORIGINAL PETITION (OCA)

05-14-2012 - Case Filing Cover Sheet CV - DC1205375 - 8561403.pdf

CASE FILING COVER SHEET

05-17-2012 - Notice of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution CV - DC1205375 - 8568295.pdf

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION

07-30-2012 - Motion - NonSuit CV - DC1205375 - 9626873.pdf

MOTION - NONSUIT

08-01-2012 - Correspondence - Letter to File CV - DC1205375 - 9655788.pdf

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE

05-14-2012 - Original Petition (OCA) CV - DC1205375 - 8561402.pdf

ORIGINAL PETITION (OCA)

05-14-2012 - Case Filing Cover Sheet CV - DC1205375 - 8561403.pdf

CASE FILING COVER SHEET

05-17-2012 - Notice of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution CV - DC1205375 - 8568295.pdf

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION

07-30-2012 - Motion - NonSuit CV - DC1205375 - 9626873.pdf

MOTION - NONSUIT

08-01-2012 - Correspondence - Letter to File CV - DC1205375 - 9655788.pdf

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE

07-31-2012 - Order - Nonsuit - DC Civ M - DC1205375 - 380 - 9642117.pdf

07-31-2012 - Order - Nonsuit - DC Civ M - DC1205375 - 380 - 9642117.pdf

07-31-2012 - Correspondence - Letter to File CV - DC1205375 - 9649521.pdf

07-31-2012 - Correspondence - Letter to File CV - DC1205375 - 9649521.pdf

05-21-2012 - Return of Service CV - DC1205375 - 8683435.pdf

05-21-2012 - Return of Service CV - DC1205375 - 8683435.pdf

05-15-2012 - Issue Citation - CV - DC1205375 - 8671618.pdf

05-15-2012 - Issue Citation - CV - DC1205375 - 8671618.pdf

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2012
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer: TILLERY, DALE; Judgment Type: NON-SUIT/DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF / PETITIONER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2012
  • DocketNOTICE SENT VIA EMAIL/FAX; Comment: fax log: nonsuit to attys

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - NONSUIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2012
  • DocketDISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: TILLERY, DALE; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED; Comment: nonsuit -- dism w/o prej

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2012
  • FinancialFinancial info for GRAHAM MORTGAGE CORP : Transaction Assessment; ; $65.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2012
  • DocketCITATION; Served: 05/19/2012; Anticipated Server: CERTIFIED MAIL; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; CERTIFIED MAIL: Returned; 05/21/2012: Comment; ATTY/CM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2012
  • FinancialFinancial info for GRAHAM MORTGAGE CORP : PAYMENT (CASE FEES); Receipt # 28355-2012-DCLK; CARRINGTON COLEMAN $325.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2012
  • FinancialFinancial info for GRAHAM MORTGAGE CORP : Transaction Assessment; ; $8.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2012
  • FinancialFinancial info for GRAHAM MORTGAGE CORP : Transaction Assessment; ; $252.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2012
  • FinancialFinancial: GRAHAM MORTGAGE CORP ; Total Financial Assessment $325.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $325.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE FILING COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2012
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less