This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 09/23/2022 at 00:34:08 (UTC).

GARLAND INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT vs. MIGUEL ANGEL VILLATORO AS TRUSTEE OF THE VILLATORO CONSTRUCTION TRUST et al

Case Summary

On 11/11/2019 GARLAND INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against MIGUEL ANGEL VILLATORO AS TRUSTEE OF THE VILLATORO CONSTRUCTION TRUST. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is SIMS, M. KENT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1917

  • Filing Date:

    11/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

SIMS, M. KENT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GARLAND INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

Defendants

MIGUEL ANGEL VILLATORO AS TRUSTEE OF THE VILLATORO CONSTRUCTION TRUST

CITY OF DALLAS

ARIZMENDI, REYNALDO

SOUTHWESTERN BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY D/B/A AT&T TEXAS

FROST BANK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REECE, LINDA D.

Defendant Attorney

CHASTAIN TIMOTHY P, .

 

Court Documents

PROPOSED ORDER FOR NONSUIT

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER FOR NONSUIT

MOTION NONSUIT

MOTION - NONSUIT

Non Jury Trial

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LGBS, CHASTAIN

Non Jury Trial LGBS

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LGBS, CHASTAIN

EXECUTED CITATION - MIGUEL ANGEL VILLATORO

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - MIGUEL ANGEL VILLATORO

LGBS

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LGBS

Non Jury Trial PERDUE

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: PERDUE

Non Jury Trial

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: TIMOTHY CHASTAIN

SOUTHWESTERN BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY D/B/A AT&T TEX

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED - SOUTHWESTERN BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY

CIT - FROST BANK

ISSUE CITATION

CIT - CITY OF DALLAS

ISSUE CITATION

SOUTHWESTERN BELL

ISSUE CITATION

CIT - REYNALDO ARIZMENDI

ISSUE CITATION

CIT - MIGUEL VILLATORO

ISSUE CITATION

LTR - CVR - ISSUE CIT(S)

REQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: REQ TO ISSUE CIT(S) 5

PERDUE

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: -PERDUE

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: - REAL

NON-SUIT/DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF / PETITIONER

Disposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer; SIMS, M. KENT; Judgment Type; NON-SUIT/DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF / PETITIONER; Judgment; Total Judgment:; of $0.00; Awarded To:; GARLAND INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT; Awarded Against:; MIGUEL ANGEL VILLATORO AS TRUSTEE OF THE VILLATORO CONSTRUCTION TRUST

51 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: SIMS, M. KENT; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer: SIMS, M. KENT; Judgment Type: NON-SUIT/DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF / PETITIONER; Judgment: Total Judgment:; of $0.00: Awarded To:; GARLAND INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT: Awarded Against:; MIGUEL ANGEL VILLATORO AS TRUSTEE OF THE VILLATORO CONSTRUCTION TRUST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER FOR NONSUIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - NONSUIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: EMAILED ZOOM INFORMATION TO PERDUE, LGBS, CHASTAIN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LGBS, CHASTAIN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for MIGUEL ANGEL VILLATORO AS TRUSTEE OF THE VILLATORO CONSTRUCTION TRUST : PAYMENT (CASE FEES); Receipt # 38854-2020-DCLK; VILLATORO CONSTRUCTION $431.14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: SIMS, M. KENT; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: BY COURT ADMINISTRATOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - MIGUEL ANGEL VILLATORO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - FROST BANK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED - SOUTHWESTERN BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for MIGUEL ANGEL VILLATORO AS TRUSTEE OF THE VILLATORO CONSTRUCTION TRUST : Transaction Assessment; ; $40.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketCITATION; Return Unserved: 05/06/2020; Anticipated Server: CONSTABLE 2; Anticipated Method: Served; 02/05/2020: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Actual Server: OUT OF COUNTY; Returned: 02/12/2020; Served: 11/13/2019; Anticipated Server: ATTORNEY; Anticipated Method: Served; 11/19/2019: Anticipated Server; CONSTABLE 1: Anticipated Method; Served: 11/13/2019; Anticipated Server: CONSTABLE 1; Anticipated Method: Comment; 5-CIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: REQ TO ISSUE CIT(S) 5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: -PERDUE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for MIGUEL ANGEL VILLATORO AS TRUSTEE OF THE VILLATORO CONSTRUCTION TRUST : Transaction Assessment; ; $237.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • FinancialFinancial: MIGUEL ANGEL VILLATORO AS TRUSTEE OF THE VILLATORO CONSTRUCTION TRUST ; Total Financial Assessment $533.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $533.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: - REAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less