This case was last updated from Dallas County Texas Courts on 06/05/2022 at 13:48:14 (UTC).

FEDEX CORPORATE SERVICES, INC. vs. PERFORMANCE PRINTING CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 05/21/2019 FEDEX CORPORATE SERVICES, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PERFORMANCE PRINTING CORPORATION. This case was filed in Dallas County Texas Courts, Dallas County Texas Courts At Law located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is BELLAN, MELISSA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********01-B

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

BELLAN, MELISSA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FEDEX CORPORATE SERVICES, INC.

Defendant

PERFORMANCE PRINTING CORPORATION

2929 Stemmons Frwy

Dallas, TX 75247

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STEWART, JOHN ALAN

 

Court Documents

EXECUTION

CORRESPONDENCE; Comment: EXECUTION

DEFAULT JUDGMENT

DEFAULT JUDGMENT

REQUEST FOR ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: REQUEST FOR ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT

PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT

MOTION - DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Comment: AMENDED CERTIFICATE W/ DEFAULT JUDGMENT

SKMBT_42319062712301.pdf

MOTION - DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Comment: W/ORDER DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND CERTIFICATE OF ATTORNEY

1ccl#2 Y Letter

DISMISSAL HEARING; Judicial Officer: BELLAN, MELISSA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

NOTICE OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Comment: C/O JOHN ALAN STEWART

NOTICE OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Comment: C/O PERFORMANCE PAINTING CORPORATION

RETURN OF SERVICE

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: PERFORMANCE PRINTING CORPORATION SERVED ON 5/31/2019@12:05PM - RETURNED ON 5/31/2019@1:01PM

PERFORMANCE PRINTING CORPORATION - WRIT OF EXECUTI

PERFORMANCE PRINTING CORPORATION - WRIT OF EXECUTI

WRIT OF EXECUTION

WRIT OF EXECUTION

EXECUTION

CORRESPONDENCE; Comment: EXECUTION

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT

REQUEST FOR ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: REQUEST FOR ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Comment: C/O PERFORMANCE PAINTING CORPORATION

NOTICE OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Comment: C/O JOHN ALAN STEWART

DEFAULT JUDGMENT

DEFAULT JUDGMENT

1ccl#2 Y Letter

DISMISSAL HEARING; Judicial Officer: BELLAN, MELISSA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketWRIT OF EXECUTION (SERVICE); Served: 10/11/2019; Anticipated Server: ATTORNEY; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; ATTORNEY: Returned; 03/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for FEDEX CORPORATE SERVICES, INC. : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (CC); Receipt # CV-2019-13761; FEDEX CORPORATE SERVICES, INC. $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for FEDEX CORPORATE SERVICES, INC. : Transaction Assessment; ; $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF EXECUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE; Comment: EXECUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for FEDEX CORPORATE SERVICES, INC. : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (CC); Receipt # CV-2019-12705; FEDEX CORPORATE SERVICES, INC. $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for FEDEX CORPORATE SERVICES, INC. : Transaction Assessment; ; $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: REQUEST FOR ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer: BELLAN, MELISSA; Judgment Type: DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Judgment: Judgment Amount:; $141,506.88: Court Costs:; $356.00: Attorney Fees:; $4,956.00: Total Judgment:; of $146,818.88: Awarded To:; FEDEX CORPORATE SERVICES, INC.: Awarded Against:; PERFORMANCE PRINTING CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Comment: AMENDED CERTIFICATE W/ DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Comment: W/ORDER DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND CERTIFICATE OF ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: PERFORMANCE PRINTING CORPORATION SERVED ON 5/31/2019@12:05PM - RETURNED ON 5/31/2019@1:01PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • DocketCITATION (SERVICE); Served: 05/31/201912:05 PM; Anticipated Server: ATTORNEY; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Returned; 05/31/2019 1:01 PM: Comment; PERFORMANCE PRINTING CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for FEDEX CORPORATE SERVICES, INC. : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (CC); Receipt # CV-2019-06791; FEDEX CORPORATE SERVICES, INC. $281.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for FEDEX CORPORATE SERVICES, INC. : Transaction Assessment; ; $281.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • FinancialFinancial: FEDEX CORPORATE SERVICES, INC. ; Total Financial Assessment $291.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $291.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION; Comment: ESERVE# 33771828

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PERFORMANCE PRINTING CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where FEDEX CORPORATE SERVICES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STEWART, JOHN ALAN