This case was last updated from Dallas County Texas Courts on 04/08/2022 at 19:59:14 (UTC).

ESTATE OF MATTIE LOU SMITH

Case Summary

On 10/14/2020 ESTATE OF MATTIE LOU SMITH was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Dallas County Texas Courts, Dallas County Probate Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMPSON, BRENDA H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********00-1

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

THOMPSON, BRENDA H

 

Party Details

Decedent

SMITH, MATTIE LOU

Applicant

MCLEAN, PATTI DIANE

Garland, TX 75043

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

SMITH, CHRISTOPHER LOU

 

Court Documents

PROBATE CASE LABEL

PROBATE CASE LABEL

ORDER - APPROVING INVENTORY AND APPRAISEMENT

ORDER - APPROVING INVENTORY AND APPRAISEMENT

Affidavit of Compliance.pdf

AFFIDAVIT OF NOTICE TO BENEFICIARIES AFTER PROBATE OF WILL; Comment: 308 AFFIDAVIT-SIGNED AND NOTARIZED

Order Approving Inventory, Appraisement & List of Claims.pdf

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: CORRESPONDENCE WITH ATTACHED ORDER

Letter to Dallas County Probate Clerk re Porposed Order.pdf

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: CORRESPONDENCE WITH ATTACHED ORDER

Publisher's Affidavit - Notice to Creditors.pdf

NOTICE TO CREDITORS

ORDER - PROBATE OF WILL AND LETTERS TESTMENTARY

ORDER - PROBATE OF WILL AND LETTERS TESTMENTARY

Oath of Executor.pdf

OATH FILED; Comment: PATTI DIANE MCLEAN

Proof of Death and Other Facts.pdf

PROOF OF DEATH AND OTHER FACTS

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - APPROVING INVENTORY AND APPRAISEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NOTICE TO BENEFICIARIES AFTER PROBATE OF WILL; Comment: 308 AFFIDAVIT-SIGNED AND NOTARIZED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: CORRESPONDENCE WITH ATTACHED ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketINVENTORY AND APPRAISEMENT - BEFORE 90; Comment: INVENTORY, APPRAISMENT AND LIST OF CLAIMS-SIGNED AND NOTARIZED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for MCLEAN, PATTI DIANE : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (CC); Receipt # PR-2020-19599; MCLEAN, PATTI DIANE $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for MCLEAN, PATTI DIANE : Transaction Assessment; ; $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PROBATE OF WILL AND LETTERS TESTMENTARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOATH FILED; Comment: PATTI DIANE MCLEAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF DEATH AND OTHER FACTS

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: PROPOSED DOCUMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWILL; Comment: WILL DATED 1/7/2016 DOD 8/22/2020 AGE 91

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN POSTED NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketPOSTED NOTICE; Served: 11/09/2020; Anticipated Server: CONSTABLE 1; Anticipated Method: CONSTABLE; Actual Server: CONSTABLE 1; Returned: 11/10/2020; Comment: RTN:11/10/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE POSTED NOTICES; Comment: COURT RTN: 11/23/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for MCLEAN, PATTI DIANE : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (CC); Receipt # PR-2020-15637; MCLEAN, PATTI DIANE $266.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for MCLEAN, PATTI DIANE : Transaction Assessment; ; $266.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: MCLEAN, PATTI DIANE ; Total Financial Assessment $276.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $276.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION; Comment: APPLICATION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND ISSUANCE OF LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SMITH, CHRISTOPHER LOU