This case was last updated from Dallas County Texas Courts on 05/03/2022 at 08:07:06 (UTC).

ESTATE OF ANN TYLER

Case Summary

On 11/12/2020 ESTATE OF ANN TYLER was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Dallas County Texas Courts, Dallas County Probate Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHNSON, MARGARET JONES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********12-3

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

JOHNSON, MARGARET JONES

 

Party Details

Decedent

TYLER, ANN

Dallas, TX 75217

Applicant

TYLER, MAVIN

Forney, TX 75126

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Decedent Attorney

SELLERS, RICHARD RYAN

Applicant Attorney

ACKELS, JOSEPH E, Jr.

 

Court Documents

Proof (Derrick) (signed).pdf

PROOF OF DEATH AND OTHER FACTS; Comment: FIRST AMENDED PROOF OF DEATH AND OTHER FACTS

Letter Requesting Letters.pdf

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: LETTER REQUESTING LETTERS OF INDEPENDENT ADMINISTRATION

ORDER - APPOINTING INDEPENDENT ADMINISTRATOR W/OUT BOND

ORDER - APPOINTING INDEPENDENT ADMINISTRATOR W/OUT BOND

Proof (Clorse) (signed).pdf

PROOF OF DEATH AND OTHER FACTS

Proof (Applicant) (signed).pdf

PROOF OF DEATH AND OTHER FACTS; Comment: PROOF OF DEATH AND OTHER FACTS

Oath (signed).pdf

OATH FILED; Comment: OATH- MAVIN TYLER

ORDER - ATTORNEY FEES

ORDER - ATTORNEY FEES

JUDGMENT DECLARING HEIRSHIP

JUDGMENT DECLARING HEIRSHIP

1st Amended Proof (Derrick Bowens).pdf

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: PROPOSED FIRST AMENDED PROOF OF DEATH AND OTHER FACTS

59 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for TYLER, MAVIN : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (CC); Receipt # PR-2022-03670; TYLER, MAVIN $6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for TYLER, MAVIN : Transaction Assessment; ; $6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: LETTER REQUESTING LETTERS OF INDEPENDENT ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - APPOINTING INDEPENDENT ADMINISTRATOR W/OUT BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF DEATH AND OTHER FACTS; Comment: FIRST AMENDED PROOF OF DEATH AND OTHER FACTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF DEATH AND OTHER FACTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF DEATH AND OTHER FACTS; Comment: PROOF OF DEATH AND OTHER FACTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOATH FILED; Comment: OATH- MAVIN TYLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - ATTORNEY FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT DECLARING HEIRSHIP

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketISSUE CITATION; Served: 12/09/2020; Anticipated Server: OTHER SERVER; Anticipated Method: CIT BY PUBLICATION; Actual Server: OTHER SERVER; Returned: 03/23/2021; Comment: RTN: 03/23/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketPOSTED NOTICE; Served: 12/07/2020; Anticipated Server: CONSTABLE 1; Anticipated Method: CONSTABLE; Actual Server: CONSTABLE 1; Returned: 12/08/2020; Comment: RTN:12/8/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE POSTED NOTICES; Comment: COURT RTN: 12/21/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for TYLER, MAVIN : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (CC); Receipt # PR-2020-17711; TYLER, MAVIN $89.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for TYLER, MAVIN : Transaction Assessment; ; $89.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for TYLER, MAVIN : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (CC); Receipt # PR-2020-17460; TYLER, MAVIN $242.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for TYLER, MAVIN : Transaction Assessment; ; $242.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: TYLER, MAVIN ; Total Financial Assessment $341.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $341.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION; Comment: APPLICATION FOR ADMINISTRATION OF ESTATE, DETERMINATION OF HEIRSHIP, APPOINTMENT OF INDEPENDENT ADMINISTRATOR AND ISSUANCE OF LETTERS OF INDEPENDENT ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ACKELS, JOSEPH E, Sr.