This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 06/02/2022 at 11:54:49 (UTC).

ERIKA BEDDINGFIELD vs. CHESAPEAKE ENERGY CORPORATION, et al

Case Summary

On 05/19/2020 ERIKA BEDDINGFIELD filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CHESAPEAKE ENERGY CORPORATION. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are SMITH, CRAIG, WILLIAMS, KRISTINA M., MOORE, MARICELA and WILLIAMS, KRISTINA M. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7024

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

SMITH, CRAIG

WILLIAMS, KRISTINA M.

MOORE, MARICELA

WILLIAMS, KRISTINA M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BEDDINGFIELD, ERIKA

Defendants

C.C. FORBES LLC

C/O Charlie J Cilfone, P.E., Plunkett, Griesenbeck & Mimari, Inc, 1635 Ne Loop 410, Suite 900

Antonio, TX 78209

FORBES ENERGY SERVICES LLC

C/O Charlie J Cilfone, P.E., Plunkett, Griesenbeck & Mimari, Inc, 1635 N. E. Loop 410, Suite 900

Antonio, TX 78209

A & L HOT OIL SERVICE INC

C/O Nicholas E Zito, Ramey, Chandler, Quinn & Zito Pc, 750 Bering Drive Suite 600

Houston, TX 77057

FORBES ENERGY SERVICES, LTD

C/O Charlie J Cilfone, P.E. Plunkett, Griesenbeck & Mimari, Inc, 1635 Ne Loop 410 , Suite 900

Antonio, TX 78209

SDS PETROLEUM CONSULTANTS, LLC

C/O Brendan P Doherty, Gieger, Laborde & Laperouse, Llc, 5151 San Felipe Suite 750

Houston, TX 77056

CHESAPEAKE ENERGY CORPORATION

C/O Joshua A Norris, Jones Walker Llp, 811 Main Street Suite 2900

Houston, TX 77002

CHESAPEAKE OPERATING LLC

C/O Joshua A Norris, Jones Walker Llp, 811 Main Street, Suite 2900

Houston, TX 77002

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PARKER, J C

Defendant Attorneys

CILFONE, CHARLES J

ZITO, NICHOLAS E

FIELDS, CHARLOTTE A

NORRIS, JOSHUA A

 

Court Documents

192nd Trial Reset Letter Tenesa

192nd Trial Reset Letter Tenesa

VACATION LETTER - KRYSTAL SCOTT

VACATION LETTER; Comment: VACATION LETTER - KRYSTAL SCOTT

MISCELLANOUS EVENT

MISCELLANOUS EVENT; Comment: FROM BNKRUPTCY COURT - NOTICE OF FILING FOURTH AMENDED PLAN SUPPLEMENT - CASE NO. 20-33233 (DRJ)

192nd Trial Reset Letter Tenesa

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, KRISTINA M.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: BY COURT ADMINISTRATOR

192nd Trial Reset Letter Tenesa

192nd Trial Reset Letter Tenesa

192nd Trial Reset Letter Tenesa

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, KRISTINA M.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: BY COURT ADMINISTRATOR

192nd Trial Reset Letter Tenesa

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, KRISTINA M.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: BY COURT ADMINISTRATOR

ORDER LIFTING STAY

MISCELLANOUS EVENT; Comment: MUTIDISTRICT LITIGATION PANEL ORDER LIFT STAY

192nd Trial Reset Letter Tenesa

192nd Trial Reset Letter Tenesa

192nd Trial Reset Letter Tenesa

192nd Trial Reset Letter Tenesa

192nd Trial Reset Letter Tenesa

192nd Trial Reset Letter Tenesa

192nd Trial Reset Letter Tenesa

192nd Trial Reset Letter Tenesa

192nd Trial Reset Letter Tenesa

192nd Trial Reset Letter Tenesa

192nd Trial Reset Letter Tenesa

192nd Trial Reset Letter Tenesa

192nd Trial Reset Letter Tenesa

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, KRISTINA M; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: BY COURT ADMINISTRATOR

192nd Trial Reset Letter Tenesa

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, KRISTINA M; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: BY COURT ADMINISTRATOR

192nd Trial Reset Letter Tenesa

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, KRISTINA M; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: BY COURT ADMINISTRATOR

192nd Trial Reset Letter Tenesa

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, KRISTINA M; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: BY COURT ADMINISTRATOR

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2033
  • DocketNOTE - ADMINISTRATOR; Comment: ****************THIS IS A MDL CASE************

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, KRISTINA M; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: BY COURT ADMINISTRATOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, KRISTINA M; Judgment Type: ORDER - CHANGE VENUE TRANSFER; Judgment: Total Judgment:; of $0.00: Awarded To:; BEDDINGFIELD, ERIKA, et al: Awarded Against:; BEDDINGFIELD, ERIKA, et al

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketJury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, KRISTINA M; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVACATION LETTER; Comment: VACATION LETTER - KRYSTAL SCOTT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketVACATION LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketREACTIVATE CASE (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMISCELLANOUS EVENT; Comment: MUTIDISTRICT LITIGATION PANEL ORDER LIFT STAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketMISCELLANOUS EVENT; Comment: FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT NOTICE OF FILING FIFTH AMENDED PLAN OF REORGANIZATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMISCELLANOUS EVENT; Comment: FROM BNKRUPTCY COURT - NOTICE OF FILING FOURTH AMENDED PLAN SUPPLEMENT - CASE NO. 20-33233 (DRJ)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 06/01/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: A & L HOT OIL SERVICE INC ; Total Financial Assessment $40.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJURY DEMAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket- GENERAL DENIAL; ORIGINAL ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket- GENERAL DENIAL; ORIGINAL ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for BEDDINGFIELD, ERIKA : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 29431-2020-DCLK; BEDDINGFIELD, ERIKA $292.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for BEDDINGFIELD, ERIKA : Transaction Assessment; ; $292.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: BEDDINGFIELD, ERIKA ; Total Financial Assessment $292.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $292.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CC FORBES, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SDS PETROLEUM CONSULTANTS, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Forbes Energy Services LTD is a litigant

Latest cases where Chesapeake Energy Corporation is a litigant