This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 08/03/2022 at 10:12:33 (UTC).

ELESIA WHITE vs. ANTHONY J ESTES, et al

Case Summary

On 11/03/2020 ELESIA WHITE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ANTHONY J ESTES,. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAMS, STACI. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6445

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAMS, STACI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WHITE, ELESIA

Dallas, TX 75201

Defendants

ESTES, ANTHONY J

Eden, NC 27288

MABE TRUCKING CO., INC

1603 Mill Ave.

Eden, NC 27288

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROLLE, LARRY

Defendant Attorney

NOORDSY, MICHAEL JAMES

 

Court Documents

101st J/NJ Trial Notice 2021

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, STACI; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED

PROPOSED AGREED ORDER TO DISMISS

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED AGREED ORDER TO DISMISS

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: AFFIDAVIT OF MEDICAL CHARGES FROM UPTOWN RADIOLOGY ASSOCIATES

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: AFFIDAVIT OF MEDICAL RECORDS FROM MRI CENTERS OF TEXAS

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: AFFIDAVIT OF MEDICAL CHARGES FROM MRI CENTERS OF TEXAS

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: AFFIDAVIT OF MEDICAL RECORDS FROM PREMIER INJURY CLINICS OF DFW

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: AFFIDAVIT OF MEDICAL CHARGES FROM PREMIER INJURY CLINICS OF DFW

101st Dismissal Letter - 2017

DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, STACI; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: BY COURT ADMINISTRATOR

ORIGINAL ANSWER - MABE TRUCKING CO., INC.

ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, STACI; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketNOTE - CLERKS; Comment: MAILED COPY OF DISMISSAL ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, STACI; Judgment Type: NON-SUIT/DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF / PETITIONER; Judgment: Total Judgment:; of $0.00: Awarded To:; WHITE, ELESIA, et al: Awarded Against:; WHITE, ELESIA, et al

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED AGREED ORDER TO DISMISS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - DISMISS; Comment: AGREED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: COVER LETTER FOR AFFIDAVITS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Comment: AFFIDAVIT OF MEDICAL CHARGES FROM ASP CARES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Comment: AFFIDAVIT OF MEDICAL CHARGES FROM UPTOWN RADIOLOGY ASSOCIATES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Comment: AFFIDAVIT OF MEDICAL RECORDS FROM MRI CENTERS OF TEXAS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Comment: AFFIDAVIT OF MEDICAL CHARGES FROM MRI CENTERS OF TEXAS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, STACI; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: BY COURT ADMINISTRATOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketCITATION; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ESERVE: Anticipated Method; Comment: MABE TRUCKING CO, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketCITATION; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ESERVE: Anticipated Method; Comment: ANTHONY J. ESTES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for WHITE, ELESIA : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 69353-2020-DCLK; WHITE, ELESIA $308.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for WHITE, ELESIA : Transaction Assessment; ; $308.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: WHITE, ELESIA ; Total Financial Assessment $308.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $308.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mabie Trucking, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHAEL J NOORDSY