This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 05/05/2022 at 07:16:27 (UTC).

DALLAS COUNTY UTILITY & RECLAMATION DISTRICT vs. NITIN JARIWALA et al

Case Summary

On 12/12/2012 DALLAS COUNTY UTILITY RECLAMATION DISTRICT filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against NITIN JARIWALA. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is SIMS, M. KENT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0862

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

SIMS, M. KENT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DALLAS COUNTY UTILITY & RECLAMATION DISTRICT

Defendants

HIRA, CHETNA

JARIWALA, NITIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATKINS, ASHLY STEELE

Defendant Attorney

MORRIS, JENNIFER

 

Court Documents

Non Jury Trial

Non Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: SIMS, M. KENT; Hearing Time: 12:01 PM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED

Non Jury Trial

Non Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: SIMS, M. KENT; Hearing Time: 12:01 PM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED

MOTION - DISMISS

MOTION - DISMISS

ORDER - VACATE (POST JUDG MOTION) (OCA and REOPEN

CASE); ORDER - VACATE (POST JUDG MOTION) (OCA and REOPEN: Comment; AGREED

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: AGREED ORDER TO VACATE JUDGMENT

MOTION - VACATE

MOTION - VACATE; Comment: AGREED

ISSUE

CITATION; ISSUE

ISSUE

CITATION; ISSUE

ISSUE

CITATION; ISSUE

ISSUE

CITATION; ISSUE

ISSUE

CITATION; ISSUE

ISSUE

CITATION; ISSUE

ISSUE

CITATION; ISSUE

MISCELLANEOUS

CONVERSION DOCKET SHEET

COVER SHEET

CASE FILING COVER SHEET

ORIGINAL PETITION (OCA)

ORIGINAL PETITION (OCA)

NON-SUIT/DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF / PETITIONER

Disposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer; SIMS, M. KENT; Judgment Type; NON-SUIT/DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF / PETITIONER

DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Disposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer; SIMS, M. KENT; Judgment Type; DEFAULT JUDGMENT

65 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: SIMS, M. KENT; Hearing Time: 12:01 PM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer: SIMS, M. KENT; Judgment Type: NON-SUIT/DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF / PETITIONER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2013
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - DISMISS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2013
  • FinancialFinancial info for DALLAS COUNTY UTILITY & RECLAMATION DISTRICT : PAYMENT (CASE FEES); Receipt # 65948-2013-DCLK; JARIWALA, NITIN $877.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE); ORDER - VACATE (POST JUDG MOTION) (OCA and REOPEN: Comment; AGREED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: AGREED ORDER TO VACATE JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - VACATE; Comment: AGREED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2013
  • DocketNOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED; Comment: NITIN JARIWALA;CHETNA HIRA:PERDUE, BRANDON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer: SIMS, M. KENT; Judgment Type: DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 01/24/2013
  • Docket1ST DUE DILIGENCE ATTEMPT - SHF; Comment: SERVED....1150A...612

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2013
  • FinancialFinancial info for DALLAS COUNTY UTILITY & RECLAMATION DISTRICT : Transaction Assessment; ; $80.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2013
  • DocketCITATION; Served: 01/16/2013; Anticipated Server: CONSTABLE 2; Anticipated Method

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2013
  • DocketCITATION; Served: 01/25/2013; Anticipated Server: SHERIFF PCT 4; Anticipated Method: Served; 02/13/2013: Anticipated Server; SHERIFF PCT 4: Anticipated Method; Return Unserved: 02/18/2013; Anticipated Server: ATTORNEY; Anticipated Method: Return Unserved; 02/21/2013: Anticipated Server; SHERIFF PCT 3: Anticipated Method; Actual Server: SHERIFF'S OFFICE; Returned: 02/21/2013; Served: 02/06/2013; Anticipated Server: ATTORNEY; Anticipated Method: Return Unserved; 02/26/2013: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Served: 01/22/2013; Anticipated Server: ATTORNEY; Anticipated Method: Unserved; Anticipated Server: ATTORNEY; Anticipated Method: Served; 01/24/2013: Anticipated Server; SHERIFF PCT 5: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; SHERIFF PCT 2: Anticipated Method

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCITATION; ISSUE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2012
  • FinancialFinancial info for DALLAS COUNTY UTILITY & RECLAMATION DISTRICT : Transaction Assessment; ; $197.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2012
  • FinancialFinancial: DALLAS COUNTY UTILITY & RECLAMATION DISTRICT ; Total Financial Assessment $727.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $727.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONVERSION DOCKET SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE FILING COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less