This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 05/05/2022 at 12:34:41 (UTC).

DALLAS COUNTY et al vs. RAFAEL BASULTO et al

Case Summary

On 10/27/2015 DALLAS COUNTY filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against RAFAEL BASULTO. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is SIMS, M. KENT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2140

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

SIMS, M. KENT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CITY OF BALCH SPRINGS

DALLAS COUNTY

DALLAS COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT

DALLAS COUNTY SCHOOL EQUALIZATION FUND

DALLAS INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

PARKLAND HOSPITAL DISTRICT

Defendants

BASULTO, RAFAEL

BASULTO, TERESA

SOUTHWESTERN BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY

STATE OF TEXAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MORENO LOPEZ, BRIDGET

Defendant Attorneys

CHASTAIN TIMOTHY P, .

JOHNSON, ALLAN M

 

Court Documents

BASULTO Notice of Appearance - TC.pdf

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL AND DESIGNATION OF ATTORNEY IN CHARGE

CITATION REQUEST

REQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: 2 TJRC, 2 MAIL ATTORNEY

ORDER FOR NON-SUIT

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER FOR NONSUIT

VMFC.pdf

MOTION - CONTINUANCE; Comment: PLAINTIFFS VERIFIED MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE

ALIAS CITATION

ISSUE CITATION

AFFIDAVIT FOR COST OF ABSTRACT

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: AFFIDAVIT FOR COST OF ABSTRACT

COVER LETTER FOR PROPOSED ORDER

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: RE: O/V/CONTINUANCE

Non Jury Trial

Non Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: SIMS, M. KENT; Hearing Time: 10:05 AM; Cancel Reason: HEARING RESCHEDULED

CITATION

ISSUE CITATION

BASULTO, RAFAEL - CITATION

BASULTO, RAFAEL - CITATION

BASULTO, RAFAEL - CITATION

BASULTO, RAFAEL - CITATION

BASULTO, RAFAEL - CITATION

BASULTO, RAFAEL - CITATION

BASULTO, RAFAEL - CITATION

BASULTO, RAFAEL - CITATION

STATE OF TEXAS - CITATION

STATE OF TEXAS - CITATION

SOUTHWESTERN BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY - CITATION

SOUTHWESTERN BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY - CITATION

BASULTO, TERESA - CITATION

BASULTO, TERESA - CITATION

Non Jury Trial

Non Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: SIMS, M. KENT; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED

Non Jury Trial

Non Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: SIMS, M. KENT; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED

69 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2017
  • FinancialFinancial info for BASULTO, RAFAEL : CHARGE / BALANCE REDUCTION; ; $376.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: SIMS, M. KENT; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer: SIMS, M. KENT; Judgment Type: NON-SUIT/DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF / PETITIONER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: RE:O/NONSUIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER FOR NONSUIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - NONSUIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: RETURN CITATION - RAFAEL BASULTO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: TIM CHASTAIN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL AND DESIGNATION OF ATTORNEY IN CHARGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • FinancialFinancial info for BASULTO, RAFAEL : Transaction Assessment; ; $8.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 11/30/2015
  • FinancialFinancial info for BASULTO, RAFAEL : Transaction Assessment; ; $80.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Comment: AFFIDAVIT FOR COST OF ABSTRACT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2015
  • FinancialFinancial info for BASULTO, RAFAEL : Transaction Assessment; ; $32.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2015
  • DocketCITATION; Return Unserved: 12/14/2015; Anticipated Server: PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER; Anticipated Method: Served; 11/19/2015: Anticipated Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Anticipated Method; Served: 11/19/2015; Anticipated Server: ATTORNEY; Anticipated Method: Served; 12/01/2015: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Comment: 4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: 2 TJRC, 2 MAIL ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • FinancialFinancial info for BASULTO, RAFAEL : Transaction Assessment; ; $232.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • FinancialFinancial: BASULTO, RAFAEL ; Total Financial Assessment $0.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2015
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less