This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 06/19/2022 at 18:51:08 (UTC).

DALLAS COUNTY et al vs. CHRIST EMBASSY HOUSTON et al

Case Summary

On 02/11/2015 DALLAS COUNTY filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against CHRIST EMBASSY HOUSTON. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is SIMS, M. KENT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0435

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

SIMS, M. KENT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CEDAR HILL INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

2777 N. Stemmons Freeway, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75207

CITY OF CEDAR HILL

Dallas, TX 75207

DALLAS COUNTY

2777 N. Stemmons Freeway, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75207

DALLAS COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT

2777 N. Stemmons Freeway, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75207

DALLAS COUNTY SCHOOL EQUALIZATION FUND

2777 N. Stemmons Freeway, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75207

PARKLAND HOSPITAL DISTRICT

2777 N. Stemmons Freeway, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75207

Defendants

CHRIST EMBASSY HOUSTON

15930 Misty Health Ln.

Houston, TX 77084

LIBERTY SAVINGS BANK FSB

3577 Clark Rd.

Sarasota, FL 34231

PHUONG MAI TRAN A/K/A PHUONG MAI BUI

1713 High Valley Ln., Cedar

Hill, TX 75104

WRI WESTGATE INDUSTRIAL LP

2600 Citadel Plaza Dr., Suite 125

Houston, TX 77008

TRAN, PHUONG MAI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

EVELYN CONNER HICKS

HICKS, EVELYN CONNER

Defendant Attorneys

ANTHONY, JOHN MATTHEW

ANTHONY, JOHN MATTHEW "MATT"

COE, LAURA J

 

Court Documents

Non Jury Trial

Non Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: SIMS, M. KENT; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED

Non Jury Trial

Non Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: SIMS, M. KENT; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED

Non Jury Trial

Non Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: SIMS, M. KENT; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED

Non Jury Trial

Non Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: SIMS, M. KENT; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED

COVER- ORDER DISMISSAL

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: RE: ORDER DISMISSAL

MOTION FOR DISMISSAL

MOTION - DISMISS

DISMISS

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: RE: ORDER DISMISSAL

ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE

ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE; Comment: AGREED

REPORT

DEPUTY ER STATEMENT; REPORT

Defendant's Original Answer.pdf

ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

CITATION

ISSUE CITATION

CITATION

ISSUE CITATION

CITATION

ISSUE CITATION

CITATION

ISSUE CITATION

REQUEST FOR CITATION

REQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: 1 TJRC, 3 MAIL ATTORNEY

AFFIDAVIT FOR COST OF ABSTRACT

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: FOR COST OF ABSTRACT/SANDRA DAUS/TST

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION

NON-SUIT/DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF / PETITIONER

Disposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer; SIMS, M. KENT; Judgment Type; NON-SUIT/DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF / PETITIONER

68 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: SIMS, M. KENT; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer: SIMS, M. KENT; Judgment Type: NON-SUIT/DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF / PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: RE: ORDER DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: RE: ORDER DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • FinancialFinancial info for CHRIST EMBASSY HOUSTON : PAYMENT (CASE FEES); Receipt # 71379-2015-DCLK; Anthony & Middlebrook PC $1027.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE; Comment: AGREED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEPUTY ER STATEMENT; REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: SIMS, M. KENT; Hearing Time: 10:05 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: O/CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 06/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2015
  • FinancialFinancial info for CHRIST EMBASSY HOUSTON : Transaction Assessment; ; $32.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2015
  • DocketCITATION; Served: 05/19/2015; Anticipated Server: ATTORNEY; Anticipated Method: Return Unserved; 05/15/2015: Anticipated Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Anticipated Method; Served: 05/20/2015; Anticipated Server: ATTORNEY; Anticipated Method: Served; 05/26/2015: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Comment: 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: 1 TJRC, 3 MAIL ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Comment: FOR COST OF ABSTRACT/SANDRA DAUS/TST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2015
  • FinancialFinancial info for CHRIST EMBASSY HOUSTON : Transaction Assessment; ; $222.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2015
  • FinancialFinancial: CHRIST EMBASSY HOUSTON ; Total Financial Assessment $262.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $262.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2015
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CEDAR HILL INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases where DALLAS COUNTY SCHOOL EQUALIZATION FUND is a litigant