This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 06/21/2022 at 09:22:35 (UTC).

CHRISTOFER D. BENNETT vs. BIG SKY PLUMBING LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 07/26/2016 CHRISTOFER D BENNETT filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against BIG SKY PLUMBING LLC,. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is MOORE, MARICELA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8943

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

MOORE, MARICELA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BENNETT, CHRISTOFER D.

Defendants

AT&T INC

AT&T LEARNING CENTER

BIG SKY PLUMBING LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HASLAM, ROBERT

Defendant Attorneys

ZAMBRANO, LUIS

ESTES, DAWN

CHASTAIN TIMOTHY P, .

OUBRE, DAVID A

HASS, JANE LEA

TRIBBLE, WESSON H

 

Court Documents

Depo Excerpts of Kevin Master.pdf

DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION; Comment: DEPOSITION EXCERPTS FROM DEPOSITION TESTIMONY OF KEVIN E. MASTER

Mtn to WDraw & Substitute.pdf

MOTION - WITHDRAW ATTORNEY; Comment: Defendants' Motion to Withdraw and Substitute Counsel

Notice of Intent to take Deposition Upon Written Questions - Order #11.pdf

CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION; Comment: Notice of Intent to take Deposition Upon Written Questions - Order #11

Big Skys Supplemental Response or SurReply to ATTs No Evidence Motion for Summary Judgment

RESPONSE; Comment: DEF(BIG SKY)/SUPPLEMENTAL RSP TO DEF(AT&T) N-E MSJ AT&T's No Evidence Motion for Summary Judgment

Plaintiff Notice of Nonsuit with Prejudice to BSP.pdf

NOTICE OF NONSUIT

plaintiffs original petition.pdf

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

18.06.18 - Notice of Hearing.pdf

NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT; Comment: D M/STRIKE

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER

Rule 203 Certification - USMD Hospital at Fort Worth - Medical.pdf

CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION; Comment: USMD Hospital at Fort Worth - Medical

362769EF.pdf

CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION; Comment: DONNA JOHNSON

ORDER - NONSUIT

ORDER - NONSUIT; Comment: AGAINST DEF(AT&T SERVICES)

18.08.13 Order Granting Nonsuit.pdf

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: Order of Nonsuit with Prejudice

18.08.13 Notice of Nonsuit.pdf

NOTICE OF NONSUIT

Order Granting Plaintiff Nonsuit with Prejudice to BSP.pdf

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: Order Granting Plaintiff Nonsuit with Prejudice to BSP

Plaintiff Notice of Nonsuit with Prejudice to BSP.pdf

NOTICE OF NONSUIT

SUBPOENA UNEXECUTED BILL C DEVENPORT D.O.

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: SUBPOENA UNEXECUTED BILL C DEVENPORT D.O.

E53406 BENNETT V BIG SKY PLUMBING TKF.pdf

SETTLED; Comment: MEDIATOR'S SUMMARY - SETTLED

162nd Jury Trial Reset Letter

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: MOORE, MARICELA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE SETTLED

560 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION; Comment: DONNA JOHNSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • DocketNOTE - CLERKS; Comment: MAILED COPY OF NONSUIT ORDER TO PLTF & DEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NONSUIT; Comment: AGAINST DEF(AT&T SERVICES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: Order of Nonsuit with Prejudice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF NONSUIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer: MOORE, MARICELA; Judgment Type: NON-SUIT/DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF / PETITIONER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • DocketNOTE - CLERKS; Comment: MAILED COPY OF NONSUIT ORDER TO PLTF & DEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • DocketREACTIVATE CASE (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: Order Granting Plaintiff Nonsuit with Prejudice to BSP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF NONSUIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
311 More Docket Entries
  • 09/19/2016
  • DocketJURY DEMAND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: BIG SKY PLUMBING LLC ROS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2016
  • DocketCITATION; Served: 08/25/2016; Anticipated Server: ATTORNEY; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; OUT OF COUNTY: Returned; 08/29/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2016
  • FinancialFinancial info for BENNETT, CHRISTOFER D. : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 46652-2016-DCLK; BENNETT, CHRISTOFER D. $299.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2016
  • FinancialFinancial info for BENNETT, CHRISTOFER D. : Transaction Assessment; ; $299.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2016
  • FinancialFinancial: BENNETT, CHRISTOFER D. ; Total Financial Assessment $399.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $399.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less