This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 06/04/2022 at 17:56:28 (UTC).

CEDARDALE RANCH & CATTLE LLC vs. STAMATINA HOLDINGS LLC AND ANGELOS KOLOBOTOS

Case Summary

On 12/29/2020 CEDARDALE RANCH CATTLE LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against STAMATINA HOLDINGS LLC AND ANGELOS KOLOBOTOS. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are MCFARLIN, SHERYL, SMITH, CRAIG, WILLIAMS, KRISTINA, WILLIAMS, KRISTINA M., WADE, KRISTIN and WILLIAMS, KRISTINA M. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9102

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

MCFARLIN, SHERYL

SMITH, CRAIG

WILLIAMS, KRISTINA

WILLIAMS, KRISTINA M.

WADE, KRISTIN

WILLIAMS, KRISTINA M

 

Party Details

Defendants and Plaintiffs

KOLOBOTOS, ANGELOS

Dallas, TX 75219

STAMATINA HOLDING LLC

4848 Lemmon Avenue #405

Dallas, TX 75219

CEDARDALE RANCH & CATTLE LLC

PEPPER, ANDREW

Richardson, TX 75085-1512

DALLAS SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT

CREEL LAW GROUP / OVATION SERVICES

1114 Lost Creek Blvd., Suite 100

Austin, TX 78746

STAMATINA HOLDINGS LLC

OVATION SERVICES, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

NASH, CONNOR

SOKATCH, JOHN C

Defendant Attorneys

NEW, EVERETT

DITTLINGER, STEPHEN L

HEMPHILL, WILLIAM RUSHING

 

Court Documents

192nd Trial Reset Letter Tenesa

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, KRISTINA M; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED

192nd Trial Reset Letter Tenesa

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, KRISTINA M; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED

192nd Trial Reset Letter Tenesa

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, KRISTINA M; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED

192nd Trial Reset Letter Tenesa

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, KRISTINA M; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED

192nd Trial Reset Letter Tenesa

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, KRISTINA M; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED

192nd Trial Reset Letter Tenesa

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, KRISTINA M; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED

192nd Trial Reset Letter Tenesa

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, KRISTINA M; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED

192nd Trial Reset Letter Tenesa

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, KRISTINA M; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED

192nd Trial Reset Letter Tenesa

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, KRISTINA M; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED

Non Jury Trial Notice

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, KRISTINA M; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED

Non Jury Trial Notice

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, KRISTINA M; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED

Non Jury Trial Notice

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, KRISTINA M; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED

Non Jury Trial Notice

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, KRISTINA M; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED

Non Jury Trial Notice

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, KRISTINA M; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED

Non Jury Trial Notice

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, KRISTINA M; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED

EXECUTED - CITATION - CREEL LAW GROUP / OVATION SERVICES - CERT MAIL

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED - CITATION - CREEL LAW GROUP / OVATION SERVICES - CERT MAIL

CREEL LAW GROUP / OVATION SERVICES - CERT MAIL

ISSUE CITATION

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION

402 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, KRISTINA M; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for PEPPER, ANDREW : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 14026-2022-DCLK; PEPPER, ANDREW $3.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for PEPPER, ANDREW : Transaction Assessment; ; $3.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: PEPPER, ANDREW ; Total Financial Assessment $3.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $3.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL; Comment: NOTICE AGREED JUDGMENT-STEPHEN DITTLINGER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED; Comment: Further Motions to Retain will be denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion - Judgment; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, KRISTINA M; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED; Comment: MTN FOR JDUGMENT FILE D01/04/22 30M CONNOR NASH 214-395-9504 (IN PERSON)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, KRISTINA M; Judgment Type: AGREED JUDGMENT; Judgment: Total Judgment:; of $0.00: Awarded To:; PEPPER, ANDREW, et al: Awarded Against:; PEPPER, ANDREW, et al

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED; Comment: - 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: AGREED FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
195 More Docket Entries
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED - CITATION - CREEL LAW GROUP / OVATION SERVICES - CERT MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketCITATION; Return Unserved: 03/29/2021; Anticipated Server: CERTIFIED MAIL; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; CERTIFIED MAIL: Returned; 03/29/2021: Comment; ANDREW PEPPER - CERT MAIL 9214 8901 0661 5400 0158 0384 49

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketCITATION; Served: 01/04/2021; Anticipated Server: CERTIFIED MAIL; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; CERTIFIED MAIL: Returned; 01/06/2021: Comment; CREEL LAW GROUP / OVATION SERVICES - CERT MAIL 9214 8901 0661 5400 0158 0385 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for STAMATINA HOLDING LLC : PAYMENT (CASE FEES); Receipt # 80843-2020-DCLK; KOLOBOTOS, ANGELOS $460.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for STAMATINA HOLDING LLC : Transaction Assessment; ; $168.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for STAMATINA HOLDING LLC : Transaction Assessment; ; $292.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: STAMATINA HOLDING LLC ; Total Financial Assessment $515.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $515.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STAMATINA HOLDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Dallas Sheriff Dept is a litigant

Latest cases where Ovation Services, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SOKATCH, JOHN CLAYTON