This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 05/31/2022 at 07:57:02 (UTC).

CARROLLTON-FARMERS BRANCH INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT vs. LUIS JIMENEZ et al

Case Summary

On 01/07/2020 CARROLLTON-FARMERS BRANCH INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against LUIS JIMENEZ. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are MOORE, MARICELA and SIMS, M. KENT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0025

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

MOORE, MARICELA

SIMS, M. KENT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CARROLLTON-FARMERS BRANCH INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

Defendants

MORTGAGEIT, INC. F/K/A MIT LENDING (IN REM ONLY)

DIAZ, MARIA MAGDALENA

JIMENEZ, LUIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REECE, LINDA D.

 

Court Documents

PROPOSED ORDER FOR NON-SUIT

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: ORDER FOR NONSUIT

MOTION FOR NON-SUIT

MOTION - NONSUIT

NON-SUIT/DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF / PETITIONER

Disposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer; SIMS, M. KENT; Judgment Type; NON-SUIT/DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF / PETITIONER; Judgment; Total Judgment:; of $0.00; Awarded To:; CARROLLTON-FARMERS BRANCH INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT; Awarded Against:; JIMENEZ, LUIS

MOTION -SUBSTITUTE SERVICE

MOTION - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE; Comment: RULE 106 SERVICE - LUIS JIMEMEZ

MORTGAGEIT INC - CITATION

REQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: ISSUE CITATION

REQUEST FOR SERVICE

REQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: ISSUE CITATION

ORDER - NONSUIT -PLAINTIFF'S

ORDER - NONSUIT; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S (JUDGE MURPHY)

PROPOSED ORDER FOR NONSUIT

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER TO NONSUIT

EXECUTED - MORTGAGEIT INC.

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED - MORTGAGIT INC.

PROPOSED ORDER FOR NON-SUIT

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: ORDER FOR NONSUIT

MOTION FOR NON-SUIT

MOTION - NONSUIT

ORDER - NONSUIT -PLAINTIFF'S

ORDER - NONSUIT; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S (JUDGE MURPHY)

PROPOSED ORDER FOR NONSUIT

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER TO NONSUIT

MOTION FOR NONSUIT

MOTION - NONSUIT

TAX EVIDENCE AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: TAX EVIDENCE

LGBS

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LGBS

ORIGINAL INTERVENTION-DALLAS COUNTY

INTERVENTION; Comment: DALLAS COUNTY, ET AL

EXECUTED CITATION - LUIS JIMENEZ

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - LUIS JIMENEZ

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for JIMENEZ, LUIS : CHARGE / BALANCE REDUCTION; ; $597.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer: SIMS, M. KENT; Judgment Type: NON-SUIT/DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF / PETITIONER; Judgment: Total Judgment:; of $0.00: Awarded To:; CARROLLTON-FARMERS BRANCH INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT: Awarded Against:; JIMENEZ, LUIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: ORDER FOR NONSUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - NONSUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: SIMS, M. KENT; Hearing Time: 10:05 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NONSUIT; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S (JUDGE MURPHY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER TO NONSUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - NONSUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Comment: TAX EVIDENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for JIMENEZ, LUIS : Transaction Assessment; ; $80.00

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED - MORTGAGIT INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for JIMENEZ, LUIS : Transaction Assessment; ; $24.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketCITATION; Return Unserved: 03/16/2020; Anticipated Server: CONSTABLE 3; Anticipated Method: Return Unserved; 03/16/2020: Anticipated Server; CONSTABLE 3: Anticipated Method; Actual Server: CONSTABLE 3; Returned: 03/16/2020; Served: 01/14/2020; Anticipated Server: CONSTABLE 1; Anticipated Method: Comment; 1 CONSTABLE PCT 1 & 2 CONSTABLE PCT 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: ISSUE CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: -PERDUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for JIMENEZ, LUIS : Transaction Assessment; ; $237.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: JIMENEZ, LUIS ; Total Financial Assessment $0.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: - REAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CARROLLTON-FARMERS BRANCH INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases where MORTGAGEIT INC. A NEW YORK CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer REECE, LINDA D.