This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 10/16/2022 at 19:12:36 (UTC).

BELLSOUTH TELECOMMUNICATIONS LLC, et al vs. PAUL R SINGH

Case Summary

On 10/14/2016 BELLSOUTH TELECOMMUNICATIONS LLC, filed an Other lawsuit against PAUL R SINGH. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are MCFARLIN, SHERYL and GOLDSTEIN, BONNIE LEE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3483

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

MCFARLIN, SHERYL

GOLDSTEIN, BONNIE LEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MICHIGAN BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY

THE OHIO BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY

SOUTHWESTERN BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY

INDIANA BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY INCORPORATED

ILLINOIS BELL TELEPHONECOMPANY

NEVADA BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY

PACIFIC BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY

WISCONSIN BELL INC

BELLSOUTH TELECOMMUNICATIONS LLC

Defendant

SINGH, PAUL R

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BLANCHARD, CHARLES JOSEF

CHASTAIN TIMOTHY P, .

 

Court Documents

Certificate_of_Last_Known_Address_of_Defendant.pdf

CERTIFICATE OF LAST KNOWN ADDRESS; Comment: PLAINTIFFS

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Comment: DEFAULT JUDGMENT - IK COMMUNICATIONS CORP

DC1613483.pdf

CITATION ISSUED

Request For Service

REQUEST FOR SERVICE

ISSUE CITATION COMM OF INS OR SOS

ISSUE CITATION COMM OF INS OR SOS; Comment: HOLD FOR SOS CHECKS/TP COPIES AT TONYA DESK 9214 8901 0661 5400 0101 2183 00 // 9214 8901 0661 5400 0101 2196 35

NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING

NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING

NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING

NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING

NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING

NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING

IK - COA.pdf

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

RETURNED MAIL

RETURNED MAIL; Comment: PAUL R. SINGH; DEFAULT JUDGMENT.

Proposed Default Order.pdf

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Default_Judgment_Motion_Against.pdf

MOTION - DEFAULT JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING

NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING

PAUL SINGH

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: PAUL SINGH

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Comment: DEFAULT JUDGMENT - IK COMMUNICATIONS CORP

NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING

NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING

IK-Certificate_of_Service.pdf

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

DC1613483.pdf

CITATION ISSUED

72 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL; Comment: PAUL R. SINGH; DEFAULT JUDGMENT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketDEFAULT MAILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketStatus Conference; Judicial Officer: GOLDSTEIN, BONNIE LEE; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: BY COURT ADMINISTRATOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer: GOLDSTEIN, BONNIE LEE; Judgment Type: DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • DocketMotion - Default Judgment; Judicial Officer: MCFARLIN, SHERYL; Hearing Time: 09:50 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • DocketStatus Conference; Judicial Officer: GOLDSTEIN, BONNIE LEE; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: BY COURT ADMINISTRATOR; Comment: INDIVIDUAL D STILL IN CASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: PAUL SINGH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
52 More Docket Entries
  • 11/03/2016
  • FinancialFinancial: SOUTHWESTERN BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY ; Total Financial Assessment $345.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $345.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION COMM OF INS OR SOS; Comment: HOLD FOR SOS CHECKS/TP COPIES AT TONYA DESK 9214 8901 0661 5400 0101 2183 00 // 9214 8901 0661 5400 0101 2196 35

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION; Comment: 9214 8901 0661 5400 0101 2215 60

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE FILING COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • FinancialFinancial info for BELLSOUTH TELECOMMUNICATIONS LLC : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 65900-2016-DCLK; BELL SOUTH TELECOMMUNICATIONS LLC $287.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • FinancialFinancial info for BELLSOUTH TELECOMMUNICATIONS LLC : Transaction Assessment; ; $287.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • FinancialFinancial: BELLSOUTH TELECOMMUNICATIONS LLC ; Total Financial Assessment $371.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $371.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less