This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 05/31/2022 at 20:26:16 (UTC).

BARBARA H. THIBODAUX vs. BRIAN ALEJANDRO LEE, et al

Case Summary

On 02/21/2020 BARBARA H THIBODAUX filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BRIAN ALEJANDRO LEE. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is WHITMORE, BRIDGETT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2935

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

WHITMORE, BRIDGETT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THIBODAUX, BARBARA H.

Dallas, TX 75201

Defendants

PHENIX TRANSPORTATION WEST, INC.

1939 Highway 35 South

Forest, MS 39074

LEE, BRIAN ALEJANDRO

Gretna, LA 70056

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HYMES, WILLIAM E

Defendant Attorney

CAWLEY, FRANK G

 

Court Documents

AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL MAILED

NOTE - CLERKS; Comment: AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL MAILED

6TH SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF FILING

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: 6TH SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF FILING

AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL MAILED

NOTE - CLERKS; Comment: AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL MAILED

AGREED MOTION FOR DISMISSAL

MOTION - DISMISS; Comment: AGREED

CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION

CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION; Comment: RANDY LEGER

LETTER REGARDING AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: REGARDING AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL

SETTLED

SETTLED

AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL

Disposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer; WHITMORE, BRIDGETT; Judgment Type; NON-SUIT/DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF / PETITIONER; Judgment; Total Judgment:; of $0.00; Awarded To:; THIBODAUX, BARBARA H.; Awarded Against:; LEE, BRIAN ALEJANDRO, et al

PROPOSED AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL

PROPOSED AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL

PROPOSED AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL

PROPOSED AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL

193rd Jury Trial Notice Whitmore

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: WHITMORE, BRIDGETT; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED; Comment: 09/30/20 JURY DEMAND PAID

193rd Jury Trial Notice Whitmore

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: WHITMORE, BRIDGETT; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED; Comment: 09/30/20 JURY DEMAND PAID

193rd Non Jury Trial Notice

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: WHITMORE, BRIDGETT; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED; Comment: 09/30/20 JURY DEMAND PAID

193rd Non Jury Trial Notice

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: WHITMORE, BRIDGETT; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED; Comment: 09/30/20 JURY DEMAND PAID

AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL MAILED

NOTE - CLERKS; Comment: AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL MAILED

AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL MAILED

NOTE - CLERKS; Comment: AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL MAILED

LETTER REGARDING AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: REGARDING AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL

AGREED MOTION FOR DISMISSAL

MOTION - DISMISS; Comment: AGREED

167 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: WHITMORE, BRIDGETT; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED; Comment: 09/30/20 JURY DEMAND PAID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer: WHITMORE, BRIDGETT; Judgment Type: NON-SUIT/DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF / PETITIONER; Judgment: Total Judgment:; of $0.00: Awarded To:; THIBODAUX, BARBARA H.: Awarded Against:; LEE, BRIAN ALEJANDRO, et al

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTE - CLERKS; Comment: AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketREACTIVATE CASE (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: REGARDING AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - DISMISS; Comment: AGREED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketINACTIVATE CASE (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSETTLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Comment: 6TH SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
78 More Docket Entries
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: WHITMORE, BRIDGETT; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Comment: 1st REQUEST BY EMAIL TO RETAIN CASE ON DOCKET FOR 30 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - PHENIX TRANSPORTATION WEST, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketCITATION; Served: 05/13/2020; Anticipated Server: ESERVE; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; OUT OF STATE: Returned; 06/10/2020: Comment; BRIAN ALEJANDRO LEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketCITATION; Served: 03/28/2020; Anticipated Server: ESERVE; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; OUT OF STATE: Returned; 03/31/2020: Comment; PHENIX TRANSPORTATION WEST, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for THIBODAUX, BARBARA H. : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 12716-2020-DCLK; THIBODAUX, BARBARA H. $308.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for THIBODAUX, BARBARA H. : Transaction Assessment; ; $308.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: THIBODAUX, BARBARA H. ; Total Financial Assessment $323.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $323.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Phenix Transportation West Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HYMES, WILLIAM E