This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 04/22/2022 at 11:48:37 (UTC).

ASL ENERGY CORP. vs. CAREBOURN PARTNERS, LLC

Case Summary

On 09/21/2012 ASL ENERGY CORP filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CAREBOURN PARTNERS, LLC. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are MCFARLIN, SHERYL and SLAUGHTER, GENA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1232

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

MCFARLIN, SHERYL

SLAUGHTER, GENA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ASL ENERGY CORP.

Defendant

CAREBOURN PARTNERS, LLC

13774 Reimer Dr, Maple

Grove, MN 55311

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JENNIFER MORRIS

MORRIS, JENNIFER

 

Court Documents

09-21-2012 - Original Petition (OCA) CV - DC1211232 - 10739533.pdf

ORIGINAL PETITION (OCA)

10-31-2012 - Return of Service CV - DC1211232 - 11368863.pdf

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: SEC OF STATE - CAREBOURN PARTNERS LLC

11-13-2012 - Motion - Default Judgment CV - DC1211232 - 11577304.pdf

MOTION - DEFAULT JUDGMENT

12-21-2012 - Correspondence - Letter to File CV - DC1211232 - 12817790.pdf

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: JUDGE

09-21-2012 - Original Petition (OCA) CV - DC1211232 - 10739533.pdf

ORIGINAL PETITION (OCA)

10-31-2012 - Return of Service CV - DC1211232 - 11368863.pdf

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: SEC OF STATE - CAREBOURN PARTNERS LLC

11-13-2012 - Motion - Default Judgment CV - DC1211232 - 11577304.pdf

MOTION - DEFAULT JUDGMENT

12-21-2012 - Correspondence - Letter to File CV - DC1211232 - 12817790.pdf

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: JUDGE

12-31-2012 - Order - Close Case - DC Civ M - DC1211232 - 859 - 12659564.pdf

12-31-2012 - Order - Close Case - DC Civ M - DC1211232 - 859 - 12659564.pdf

10-02-2012 - Return of Service CV - DC1211232 - 10789793.pdf

10-02-2012 - Return of Service CV - DC1211232 - 10789793.pdf

09-27-2012 - Issue Citation - CV - DC1211232 - 10690278.pdf

09-27-2012 - Issue Citation - CV - DC1211232 - 10690278.pdf

11-19-2012 - Notice of Hearing-Fiat CV - DC1211232 - 11703517.pdf

11-19-2012 - Notice of Hearing-Fiat CV - DC1211232 - 11703517.pdf

12-06-2012 - Notice of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution CV - DC1211232 - 12061823.pdf

12-06-2012 - Notice of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution CV - DC1211232 - 12061823.pdf

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/31/2012
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer: SLAUGHTER, GENA; Judgment Type: ALL OTHER DISPOSITIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2012
  • DocketDISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: SLAUGHTER, GENA; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2012
  • DocketNOTE - CLERKS; Comment: LTR RE: DISMISSAL DKT - SUBMITTED TO JUDGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: JUDGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2012
  • DocketMotion - Default Judgment; Judicial Officer: MCFARLIN, SHERYL; Hearing Time: 03:00 PM; Cancel Reason: REQUESTED BY ATTORNEY/PRO SE; Comment: JACKIE 214-855-3378

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2012
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: RE:HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: SEC OF STATE - CAREBOURN PARTNERS LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2012
  • DocketCITATION SOS/COI/COH/HAG; Served: 10/01/2012; Anticipated Server: CERTIFIED MAIL; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; CERTIFIED MAIL: Returned; 10/02/2012: Comment; EL/TRCK#9214 8901 0661 5400 0004 7692 68

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2012
  • FinancialFinancial info for ASL ENERGY CORP. : PAYMENT (CASE FEES); Receipt # 55867-2012-DCLK; SHURON WILLIAMS $4.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2012
  • FinancialFinancial info for ASL ENERGY CORP. : PAYMENT (CASE FEES); Receipt # 55865-2012-DCLK; CARRINGTON COLEMAN $325.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2012
  • FinancialFinancial info for ASL ENERGY CORP. : Transaction Assessment; ; $77.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2012
  • FinancialFinancial info for ASL ENERGY CORP. : Transaction Assessment; ; $252.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2012
  • FinancialFinancial: ASL ENERGY CORP. ; Total Financial Assessment $329.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $329.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2012
  • DocketISSUE CITATION COMM OF INS OR SOS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Carebourn Partners, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MORRIS, JENNIFER