This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 05/27/2022 at 14:30:31 (UTC).

ANGEL HOSPITALITY VI, LLC vs. DALLAS CENTRAL APPRAISAL DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 08/30/2019 ANGEL HOSPITALITY VI, LLC filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against DALLAS CENTRAL APPRAISAL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is TILLERY, DALE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3486

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

TILLERY, DALE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANGEL HOSPITALITY VI, LLC

Defendant

DALLAS CENTRAL APPRAISAL DISTRICT

2949 North Stemmons Freeway

Dallas, TX 75247

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GANDHI, NIRAL

Defendant Attorney

METCALF, BRADEN W.

 

Court Documents

MOTION

- NONSUIT; MOTION: Comment; PLAINTIFF'S

ORDER

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED /JUDGMENT; ORDER: Comment; PROPOSED ORDER OF NONSUIT

NON-SUIT/DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF / PETITIONER

Disposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer; TILLERY, DALE; Judgment Type; NON-SUIT/DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF / PETITIONER; Judgment; Total Judgment:; of $0.00; Awarded To:; ANGEL HOSPITALITY VI, LLC, et al; Awarded Against:; ANGEL HOSPITALITY VI, LLC, et al

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION

RETURN OF SERVICE

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - DALLAS CENTRAL APPRAISAL DISTRICT

CORRESPONDENCE LETTER

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE

SCHEDULING ORDER

SCHEDULING ORDER

ANGEL HOSPITALITY VI, LLC - 19-13486.pdf

ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

ORDER

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED /JUDGMENT; ORDER: Comment; PROPOSED ORDER OF NONSUIT

MOTION

- NONSUIT; MOTION: Comment; PLAINTIFF'S

SCHEDULING ORDER

SCHEDULING ORDER

DC-19-13486 TrialNtcLtr wSO.pdf

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: NOTICE OF TRIAL w LEVEL 3 USO

RETURN OF SERVICE

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - DALLAS CENTRAL APPRAISAL DISTRICT

ANGEL HOSPITALITY VI, LLC - 19-13486.pdf

ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

DC-19-13486 NDWOP.pdf

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Comment: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION

CORRESPONDENCE LETTER

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketNon Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: TILLERY, DALE; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer: TILLERY, DALE; Judgment Type: NON-SUIT/DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF / PETITIONER; Judgment: Total Judgment:; of $0.00: Awarded To:; ANGEL HOSPITALITY VI, LLC, et al: Awarded Against:; ANGEL HOSPITALITY VI, LLC, et al

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED /JUDGMENT; ORDER: Comment; PROPOSED ORDER OF NONSUIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket- NONSUIT; MOTION: Comment; PLAINTIFF'S

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketDISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: TILLERY, DALE; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: BY COURT ADMINISTRATOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSCHEDULING ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: NOTICE OF TRIAL w LEVEL 3 USO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - DALLAS CENTRAL APPRAISAL DISTRICT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketCITATION; Served: 09/10/2019; Anticipated Server: ESERVE; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Returned; 09/20/2019: Comment; ESERVE DALLAS CENTRAL APPRAISAL DISTRICT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Comment: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for ANGEL HOSPITALITY VI, LLC : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 59333-2019-DCLK; ANGEL HOSPITALITY VI, LLC $300.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for ANGEL HOSPITALITY VI, LLC : Transaction Assessment; ; $300.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • FinancialFinancial: ANGEL HOSPITALITY VI, LLC ; Total Financial Assessment $300.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $300.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE FILING COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less